EP2911612 - VALVE PROSTHESIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.04.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.03.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.02.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medtronic Inc. 710 Medtronic Parkway Minneapolis, MN 55432 / US | [2015/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DWORK, Joshua c/o IP Legal Department Medtronic Vascular Inc. 3576 Unocal Place Santa Rosa, California 95403 / US | [2015/36] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [2015/36] | Application number, filing date | 13784054.2 | 05.10.2013 | [2015/36] | WO2013US63600 | Priority number, date | US201213658044 | 23.10.2012 Original published format: US201213658044 | [2015/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014066017 | Date: | 01.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2911612 | Date: | 02.09.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.05.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2911612 | Date: | 17.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/24 | [2015/36] | CPC: |
A61F2/2418 (EP,US);
A61F2/2427 (US);
A61F2/2433 (US);
A61F2/2436 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0013 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0078 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KLAPPENPROTHESE | [2015/36] | English: | VALVE PROSTHESIS | [2015/36] | French: | PROTHÈSE DE VALVULE | [2015/36] | Entry into regional phase | 05.05.2015 | National basic fee paid | 05.05.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.05.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.05.2015 | Examination requested [2015/36] | 07.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 08.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.11.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 19.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2006064174 (ZADNO REZA [US]); | [A]WO2008029296 (ENDOCOR PTE LTD [SG], et al); | [X]WO2009053497 (SYMETIS SA [CH], et al); | [XA]WO2011002996 (CLEVELAND CLINIC FOUNDATION [US]); | [XA]WO2011057087 (TRUSTEES UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA [US], et al) | Examination | WO2009094188 |