EP2844347 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR TREATING B-LYMPHOID MALIGNANCIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.09.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.10.2020 [2020/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Children's Hospital of Philadelphia 34th Street & Civic Center Boulevard Philadelphia, PA 19104 / US | For all designated states Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania 3160 Chestnut Street, Suite 200 Philadelphia, PA 19104 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2015/11] | For all designated states The Children's Hospital of Philadelphia 34th Street & Civic Center Boulevard Philadelphia, PA 19104 / US | ||
For all designated states Trustees Of The University Of Pennsylvania 3160 Chestnut Street, Suite 200 Philadelphia, PA 19104 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THOMAS-TIKHONENKO, Andrei 2007 Pine Street Philadelphia, PA 19103 / US | 02 /
CHUNG, Elaine 206 S. 13th Street 1503 Philadelphia, PA 19107 / US | 03 /
PSATHAS, James 130 Wilson Avenue Glenside, PA 19038 / US | [2015/11] | Representative(s) | Schneiter, Sorin, et al Omnis IP SA Avenue de Riond-Bosson 3 1110 Morges / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2015/11] | Schneiter, Sorin Schneiter & Vuille Chemin de Champ-Colomb 7B 1024 Ecublens / CH | Application number, filing date | 13784350.4 | 01.05.2013 | WO2013US39067 | Priority number, date | US201261640987P | 01.05.2012 Original published format: US 201261640987 P | [2015/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013166150 | Date: | 07.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2844347 | Date: | 11.03.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.11.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.11.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61P35/02, C12Q1/48, G01N33/50 | [2016/13] | CPC: |
G01N33/5011 (EP,US);
G01N33/573 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/39533 (KR);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
C12Q1/485 (EP,US);
C12Y207/01137 (KR);
G01N33/5052 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
G01N2333/70596 (EP,KR,US);
G01N2333/91215 (EP,KR,US);
G01N2500/02 (US);
G01N2500/10 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/11] | A61P35/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/11] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON B-LYMPHOIDEN MALIGNOMEN | [2015/11] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR TREATING B-LYMPHOID MALIGNANCIES | [2015/11] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET PROCÉDÉS POUR TRAITER DES TUMEURS MALIGNES B-LYMPHOÏDES | [2015/11] | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.2014 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.2014 | Search fee paid | 24.11.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/11] | 26.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/44] | 24.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/44] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.03.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2012082664 (BERNETT MATTHEW J [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * cited in the ISR * * abstract * * paragraph [0128] * * paragraphs [0254] - [0256] * [Y] 5 [I] 6; | [XYI] - AWAN FARRUKH T ET AL, CD19 targeting of chronic lymphocytic leukemia with a novel Fc-domain-engineered monoclonal antibody, BLOOD, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEMATOLOGY, US, PAGE(S) 1204 - 1213, (20100201), ISSN 0006-4971, XP009143421 [X] 1-4 * abstract * [Y] 5 [I] 6 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2009-06-229039 | [Y] - NOBUKO ISHIURA ET AL, "Differential phosphorylation of functional tyrosines in CD19 modulates B-lymphocyte activation", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, DE, (20100425), vol. 40, no. 4, doi:10.1002/eji.200939848, ISSN 0014-2980, pages 1192 - 1204, XP055241634 [Y] 5 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/eji.200939848 | [Y] - SO L ET AL, "PI3K signalling in B- and T-lymphocytes: new developments and therapeutic advances", BIOCHEMICAL JOURNAL, GB, (20120315), vol. 442, no. 3, doi:10.1042/BJ20112092, ISSN 0264-6021, pages 465 - 481, XP055095314 [Y] 7-11 * cited in the ISR * * abstract * * page 469, column 2 - page 470, column 1 * * figures 1-2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1042/BJ20112092 | [Y] - LANNUTTI BRIAN J ET AL, "CAL-101, a p110delta selective phosphatidylinositol-3-kinase inhibitor for the treatment of B-cell malignancies, inhibits PI3K signaling and cellular viability", BLOOD, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEMATOLOGY, UNITED STATES, vol. 117, no. 2, doi:10.1182/BLOOD-2010-03-275305, ISSN 1528-0020, (20110113), pages 591 - 594, URL: http://www.bloodjournal.org/, XP008152256 [Y] 7-11 * cited in the ISR * * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2010-03-275305 | [Y] - M Beckwith ET AL, "The protein product of the proto-oncogene c-cbl forms a complex with phosphatidylinositol 3-kinase p85 and CD19 in anti-IgM-stimulated human B-lymphoma cells", Blood, UNITED STATES, (19961101), page 3502, URL: http://www.bloodjournal.org/content/88/9/3502.full.pdf, (20160215), XP055250165 [Y] 7-11 * the whole document * | [IP] - ELAINE Y. CHUNG ET AL, "CD19 is a major B cell receptor-independent activator of MYC-driven B-lymphomagenesis", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL INVESTIGATION, US, (20120501), vol. 122, no. 6, doi:10.1172/JCI45851, ISSN 0021-9738, pages 2257 - 2266, XP055250174 [IP] 1-11 * the whole document * * page 2263, column 2, paragraph 1 - page 2264, column 1, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1172/JCI45851 | International search | [Y]US2012082664 (BERNETT MATTHEW J [US], et al); | [X] - SO L. ET AL., "PI3K Signaling in B and T Lymphocytes: New Developments and Therapeutic Advances", BIOCHEMISTRY JOURNAL, (20120315), vol. 442, no. 3, pages 465 - 481 (1-37), XP055095314 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1042/BJ20112092 | [Y] - OTERO ET AL., "Cd19-dependent activation of Akt kinase in B-lymphocytes", J BIOL CHEM., (20010112), vol. 276, no. 2, pages 1474 - 1478, XP055171335 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M003918200 | [Y] - LANNUTTI ET AL., "CAL-101, a p110delta selective phosphatidylinositol-3-kinase inhibitor for the treatment of B-cell malignancies, inhibits PI3K signaling and cellular viability", BLOOD, (20110113), vol. 117, no. 2, pages 591 - 594, XP008152256 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2010-03-275305 | [Y] - ENGEL ET AL., "Abnormal B Lymphocyte Deleveopment, Activation, and Differentiation in Mice that Lack or Overexpress the CD19 Signal Transduction Molecule", IMMUNITY, (199507), vol. 3, pages 39 - 50, XP055171337 |