EP2816746 - MULTI-WAVELENGTH LIGHT SOURCE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.04.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.05.2016 [2016/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2014/52] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAI, Xiquan Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2014/52] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/52] | Lord, Michael Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 13785335.4 | 07.08.2013 | WO2013CN80962 | Priority number, date | CN20121587190 | 28.12.2012 Original published format: CN201210587190 | [2014/52] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014101427 | Date: | 03.07.2014 | Language: | ZH | [2014/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2816746 | Date: | 24.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 03.07.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/50, H01S3/10, H01S3/067, H01S3/00, // H01S3/0941, H01S3/23, H01S3/08, H01S3/094, H01S3/16 | [2015/19] | CPC: |
H04B10/506 (EP);
H01S3/0078 (EP);
H01S3/06754 (EP);
H01S3/06758 (EP);
H01S3/06795 (EP);
H01S2301/04 (EP);
H01S3/0064 (EP);
H01S3/06766 (EP);
H01S3/0677 (EP);
H01S3/094003 (EP);
H01S3/094061 (EP);
H01S3/09415 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2014/52] | H04B10/50, H01S3/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/52] | Title | German: | LICHTQUELLENVORRICHTUNG MIT MEHREREN WELLENLÄNGEN | [2014/52] | English: | MULTI-WAVELENGTH LIGHT SOURCE DEVICE | [2014/52] | French: | DISPOSITIF SOURCE DE LUMIÈRE À MULTIPLES LONGUEURS D'ONDE | [2014/52] | Entry into regional phase | 08.11.2013 | Translation filed | 08.11.2013 | National basic fee paid | 08.11.2013 | Search fee paid | 08.11.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.11.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.11.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.11.2013 | Examination requested [2014/52] | 03.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/19] | 16.12.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/19] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2015 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6195200 (DEMARCO JOHN JOSEPH [US] ET AL) [X] 1-3,7,8,10,11 * column 2, line 32 - column 4, line 15; figure 2, *; | [X]WO2011149122 (LUXPERT TECHNOLOGIES CO LTD [KR]; KIM KYOUNG MIN [KR]) [X] 1,7-10 * abstract *; | [XI]US5566018 (LEE JAE S [KR] ET AL) [X] 1,4,6,9-11 * column 2, line 56 - column 4, line 33; figures 1,4 * [I] 5; | [X]WO2004047344 (NOVERA OPTICS INC [US]; INST OF INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY [KR]; LEE CHANG) [X] 1,2,4,9-11 * paragraphs [0019] - [0024] - [0027] , [0028] , [0033]; figures 3,4,6 * | International search | [X]CN101483308 (JIANGXI NORMAL UNIVERSITY); | [Y]CN1430096 (LG ELECTRONICS INC.); | [XP]CN103067092 (HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD.); | [A]CN201993557U (HOPECOM OPTIC COMMUNICATIONS CO., LTD.); | [A]CN1540429 (SHANGHAI JIAO TONG UNIVERSITY); | [A]CN1410824 (ZHEJIANG UNIVERSITY) |