blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2906296

EP2906296 - PYRROLOBENZODIAZEPINE-ANTIBODY CONJUGATES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.01.2019
Database last updated on 05.05.2025
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  16.02.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  18.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip25.01.2019No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.02.2019  [2019/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ADC Therapeutics SA
Route de la Corniche 3B
1066 Epalinges / CH
For all designated states
Medimmune Limited
Milstein Building Granta Park
Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB21 6GH / GB
[2018/12]
Former [2017/11]For all designated states
ADC Therapeutics SA
route de la Corniche 3B
1066 Epalinges / CH
For all designated states
Medimmune Limited
Milstein Building Granta Park
Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB21 6GH / GB
Former [2015/34]For all designated states
ADC Therapeutics S.a.r.l.
Rue Saint-Pierre 2
1003 Lausanne / CH
For all designated states
Medimmune Limited
Milstein Building Granta Park
Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB21 6GH / GB
Inventor(s)01 / VAN BERKEL, Patricius Hendrikus Cornelis
ADC Therapeutics Sàrl
c/o Michael Forer
Rue Saint-Pierre 2
1003 Lausanne / CH
02 / HOWARD, Philip Wilson
Spirogen Limited The QMB Innovation Centre
42 New Road
London Greater London E1 2AX / GB
 [2015/34]
Representative(s)Mewburn Ellis LLP
Aurora Building
Counterslip
Bristol BS1 6BX / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/34]Watson, Robert James, et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
Application number, filing date13785373.511.10.2013
[2015/34]
WO2013EP71349
Priority number, dateUS201261712924P12.10.2012         Original published format: US 201261712924 P
US201261712928P12.10.2012         Original published format: US 201261712928 P
US201361798106P15.03.2013         Original published format: US 201361798106 P
US201361798037P15.03.2013         Original published format: US 201361798037 P
US201361798072P15.03.2013         Original published format: US 201361798072 P
[2015/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2014057119
Date:17.04.2014
Language:EN
[2014/16]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2906296
Date:19.08.2015
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.04.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2015/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2906296
Date:21.03.2018
Language:EN
[2018/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.04.2014
ClassificationIPC:A61K47/50, A61K45/06, A61K31/5517, C07K16/28, A61P39/00, A61P35/00
[2017/19]
CPC:
A61K47/6849 (EP,US); A61K31/5517 (EP,US); A61K45/06 (US);
A61K47/68035 (EP,US); A61P35/00 (EP); A61P39/00 (EP);
C07K16/2866 (US); A61K39/001119 (EP,US); C07K2317/565 (US) (-)
Former IPC [2015/34]A61P39/00, A61K47/48, A61P35/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/34]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:PYRROLOBENZODIAZEPIN-ANTIKÖRPER-KONJUGATE[2015/34]
English:PYRROLOBENZODIAZEPINE-ANTIBODY CONJUGATES[2015/34]
French:CONJUGUÉS ANTICORPS - PYRROLOBENZODIAZÉPINE[2015/34]
Entry into regional phase06.05.2015National basic fee paid 
06.05.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
06.05.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.05.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.05.2015Examination requested  [2015/34]
08.06.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.10.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.10.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.02.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
05.02.2018Fee for grant paid
05.02.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.06.2016
Opposition(s)02.01.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
24.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
25.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]WO2008087184  (SERONO LAB [CH], et al);
 [A]US2010203007  (LI WEI [US], et al);
 [A]WO2012112687  (IMMUNOGEN INC [US], et al);
by applicantJPS58180487
 US4816567
 US5583024
 US5621002
 US5674713
 US5700670
 WO9813059
 WO0012507
 US6214345
 US6218519
 US6268488
 WO02088172
 WO03026577
 US2003096743
 WO03043583
 US2003130189
 US6602677
 US6677435
 US2004018194
 US2004052793
 WO2004032828
 WO2004045512
 US2004121940
 US6759509
 US6835807
 WO2005079479
 WO2005082023
 US2005271615
 US2006116422
 WO2007044515
 US7223837
 WO2007085930
 US7375078
 US2008206239
 US7521541
 WO2009052249
 WO2010043380
 WO2010043880
 US7723485
 WO2011130613
 WO2011130616
 WO2011130598
 WO2011130615
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.