Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9962895 | Global Dossier | 08.05.2018 | B2 | US2015224731 | 13.08.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITBO20120463 | 31.08.2012 | WO2013IB58048 | 28.08.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6273555B | Global Dossier | 07.02.2018 | B2 | JP2015530291 | 15.10.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | ITBO20120463 | 31.08.2012 | WO2013IB58048 | 28.08.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104718067B | Global Dossier | 29.03.2017 | B | CN104718067 | 17.06.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | ITBO20120463 | 31.08.2012 | WO2013IB58048 | 28.08.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2890554 | Global Dossier | 30.03.2016 | B1 | EP2890554 | 08.07.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITBO20120463 | 31.08.2012 | WO2013IB58048 | 28.08.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112015004533 | 29.09.2020 | B1 | BR112015004533 | 04.07.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | ITBO20120463 | 31.08.2012 | WO2013IB58048 | 28.08.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2883265 | 06.03.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITBO20120463 | 31.08.2012 | WO2013IB58048 | 28.08.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2578002T | 20.07.2016 | T3 | Priority number | Date | ITBO20120463 | 31.08.2012 | WO2013IB58048 | 28.08.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014033635 | Global Dossier | 06.03.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITBO20120463 | 31.08.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ITBO20120463 | 01.03.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITBO20120463 | 31.08.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2890554T | 30.11.2016 | T3 | Priority number | Date | ITBO20120463 | 31.08.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT2890554T | 13.07.2016 | T | Priority number | Date | ITBO20120463 | 31.08.2012 |