EP2909978 - OVERLAY SERVICES IN COMMUNICATION NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.11.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.12.2019 [2019/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cisco Technology, Inc. 170 W. Tasman Drive San Jose, CA 95134-1706 / US | [2015/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORENO, Victor 4512 Salisbury Drive Carlsbad, CA 92010 / US | 02 /
FARINACCI, Dino 20535 Sprawling Oaks Court San Jose, CA 95120 / US | 03 /
MAINO, Fabio 165 Forest Ave. 4A Palo Alto, CA 94301 / US | [2015/35] | Representative(s) | Kazi, Ilya, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/35] | Kazi, Ilya, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | Application number, filing date | 13785701.7 | 14.10.2013 | [2015/35] | WO2013US64882 | Priority number, date | US201261716284P | 19.10.2012 Original published format: US 201261716284 P | US201313751717 | 28.01.2013 Original published format: US201313751717 | [2015/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014062584 | Date: | 24.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2909978 | Date: | 26.08.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.04.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/46, H04L29/12 | [2015/35] | CPC: |
H04L61/103 (EP,US);
H04L45/64 (US);
H04L12/4633 (EP,US);
H04L12/4641 (EP,US);
H04L12/6418 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/35] | Title | German: | ÜBERLAGERUNGSDIENSTE IN KOMMUNIKATIONSNETZEN | [2015/35] | English: | OVERLAY SERVICES IN COMMUNICATION NETWORKS | [2015/35] | French: | SERVICES DE SUPERPOSITION DANS DES RÉSEAUX DE COMMUNICATION | [2015/35] | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.2015 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.03.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/35] | 06.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.07.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/49] | 29.07.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/49] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.12.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI] - MAINO V ERMAGAN D FARINACCI CISCO SYSTEMS M SMITH INSIEME NETWORKS F, "LISP Control Plane for Network Virtualization Overlays; draft-maino-nvo3-lisp-cp-01.txt", LISP CONTROL PLANE FOR NETWORK VIRTUALIZATION OVERLAYS; DRAFT-MAINO-NVO3-LISP-CP-01.TXT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF; STANDARDWORKINGDRAFT, INTERNET SOCIETY (ISOC) 4, RUE DES FALAISES CH- 1205 GENEVA, SWITZERLAND, (20120920), pages 1 - 19, XP015084948 [X] 1-5,7-12,14,15 * Sections (including sub-sections) 1, 3 and 4 * [I] 6,13,16 | [A] - FULLER D FARINACCI CISCO SYSTEMS V, "LISP Map Server Interface; draft-ietf-lisp-ms-14.txt", LISP MAP SERVER INTERFACE; DRAFT-IETF-LISP-MS-14.TXT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF; STANDARDWORKINGDRAFT, INTERNET SOCIETY (ISOC) 4, RUE DES FALAISES CH- 1205 GENEVA, SWITZERLAND, (20111217), pages 1 - 16, XP015079794 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * | Examination | - FORD P S ET AL, "Improving the routing and addressing of IP", IEEE NETWORK, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19930501), vol. 7, no. 3, doi:10.1109/65.224023, ISSN 0890-8044, pages 10 - 15, XP011419264 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/65.224023 | by applicant | US8166205 |