EP2917612 - LIGHT COMPOSITE PISTON [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.10.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.11.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.08.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GE Oil & Gas Compression Systems, LLC 4425 Westway Park Boulevard Houston, TX 77041 / US | [2015/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KABIR, Omar, M. 16250 Port Northwest Drive Houston, TX 77041 / US | 02 /
BARTOS, John, C. 4646 W. Sam Houston Pkwy. N. Houston, TX 77041 / US | 03 /
PEARL, Kent 16250 Port Northwest Drive Houston, TX 77041 / US | [2015/38] | Representative(s) | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth, et al Baker Hughes 245 Hammersmith Chalk Hill Road London W6 8DW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/38] | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 13786082.1 | 21.10.2013 | [2015/38] | WO2013US65994 | Priority number, date | US201213674925 | 12.11.2012 Original published format: US201213674925 | [2015/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014074291 | Date: | 15.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2917612 | Date: | 16.09.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.05.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2917612 | Date: | 12.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F16J1/00, F16J1/01 | [2015/38] | CPC: |
F16J1/01 (EP,RU,US);
F04B53/14 (RU,US);
F16C5/00 (EP,US);
F16J1/005 (EP,RU,US);
F16J1/006 (EP,RU,US);
F16J1/12 (US);
F02F3/0084 (US);
F16C11/02 (EP,US);
F16C29/02 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LEICHTER VERBUNDKOLBEN | [2015/38] | English: | LIGHT COMPOSITE PISTON | [2015/38] | French: | PISTON COMPOSITE LÉGER | [2015/38] | Entry into regional phase | 12.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 12.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/38] | 31.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.09.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.01.2017 | Opposition(s) | 13.09.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.10.2013 | AL | 12.12.2018 | AT | 12.12.2018 | CY | 12.12.2018 | CZ | 12.12.2018 | DK | 12.12.2018 | EE | 12.12.2018 | ES | 12.12.2018 | FI | 12.12.2018 | HR | 12.12.2018 | IT | 12.12.2018 | LT | 12.12.2018 | LV | 12.12.2018 | MK | 12.12.2018 | MT | 12.12.2018 | NL | 12.12.2018 | PL | 12.12.2018 | RO | 12.12.2018 | RS | 12.12.2018 | SE | 12.12.2018 | SI | 12.12.2018 | SK | 12.12.2018 | SM | 12.12.2018 | TR | 12.12.2018 | BG | 12.03.2019 | NO | 12.03.2019 | GR | 13.03.2019 | IS | 12.04.2019 | PT | 12.04.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 21.10.2013 | |
AL | 12.12.2018 | ||
AT | 12.12.2018 | ||
CY | 12.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
DK | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
MT | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SI | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
TR | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 21.10.2013 | |
AL | 12.12.2018 | ||
AT | 12.12.2018 | ||
CY | 12.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
DK | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SI | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
TR | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
AT | 12.12.2018 | ||
CY | 12.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
DK | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SI | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
TR | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
AT | 12.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
DK | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SI | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
TR | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
AT | 12.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
DK | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SI | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
AT | 12.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
DK | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
AT | 12.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | ES | 12.12.2018 | |
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | ES | 12.12.2018 | |
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 12.12.2018 | |
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 12.12.2018 | |
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 12.12.2018 | |
NO | 12.03.2019 | Cited in | International search | [X]US3636824 (CLARK NORMAN E); | [X]GB2174730 (TRADE AND INDUSTRY THE SECRETA); | [A]US5878652 (KOTTKE RICHARD [DE]); | [A]US6675699 (PIPPERT FREDERICK B [US]) |