EP2912165 - RENAL CELL POPULATIONS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 05.05.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.12.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states inRegen P.O. Box 309 Ugland House South Church Street George Town Grand Cayman KY1-1104 / KY | [2017/34] |
Former [2016/20] | For all designated states RegenMed (Cayman) Ltd. P.O.Box 309 Ugland House South Church Street George Town Grand Cayman KY1-1104 / KY | ||
Former [2015/36] | For all designated states Regenmedtx, LLC 3929 West Point Blvd., Suite G Winston-Salem NC 27103 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BASU, Joydeep 3929 Westpoint Blvd. G Winston-Salem, NC 27103 / US | 02 /
GUTHRIE, Kelly 3929 Westpoint Blvd. G Winston-Salem, NC 27103 / US | 03 /
JUSTEWICZ, Dominic 3929 Westpoint Blvd. G Winston-Salem, NC 27103 / US | 04 /
BURNETTE, Teresa 3929 Westpoint Blvd. G Winston-Salem, NC 27103 / US | 05 /
BRUCE, Andrew 3929 Westpoint Blvd. G Winston-Salem, NC 27103 / US | 06 /
KELLEY, Russell, W. 3929 Westpoint Blvd. G Winston-Salem, NC 27103 / US | 07 /
LUDLOW, John, W. 3929 Westpoint Blvd. G Winston-Salem, NC 27103 / US | [2015/36] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/25] | Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | ||
Former [2015/36] | Woolley, Lindsey Claire, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | Application number, filing date | 13786132.4 | 24.10.2013 | [2015/36] | WO2013US66707 | Priority number, date | US201261718150P | 24.10.2012 Original published format: US 201261718150 P | US201361876616P | 11.09.2013 Original published format: US 201361876616 P | [2015/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014066699 | Date: | 01.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2912165 | Date: | 02.09.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.05.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2912165 | Date: | 19.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/071 | [2015/36] | CPC: |
A61K35/22 (EP,KR,US);
C12N5/00 (RU);
A61K47/42 (KR);
A61P13/12 (EP,KR);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K14/4741 (KR);
C12N15/85 (KR);
C12N5/0081 (EP,US);
C12N5/0686 (EP,KR,US);
C12N9/104 (KR);
C12Y203/02002 (KR);
G01N33/56966 (US);
C12N2500/02 (EP,US);
C12N2501/58 (EP,US);
C12N2501/599 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NIERENZELLPOPULATIONEN UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2015/36] | English: | RENAL CELL POPULATIONS AND USES THEREOF | [2015/36] | French: | POPULATIONS DE CELLULES RÉNALES ET UTILISATIONS DE CELLES-CI | [2015/36] | Entry into regional phase | 12.05.2015 | National basic fee paid | 12.05.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.05.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.05.2015 | Examination requested [2015/36] | 04.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 04.03.2016 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 16.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 11.04.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.04.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP19168775.5 / EP3567099 | EP21169079.7 / EP3901251 | EP24215095.1 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.06.2016 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/32] | Request for further processing for: | Loss of rights: Claims | 16.05.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 16.05.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.05.2016 | Decision despatched | 16.05.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 16.05.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.05.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 19.06.2019 | CY | 19.06.2019 | EE | 19.06.2019 | HR | 19.06.2019 | LT | 19.06.2019 | LV | 19.06.2019 | MC | 19.06.2019 | MK | 19.06.2019 | MT | 19.06.2019 | RS | 19.06.2019 | SM | 19.06.2019 | BG | 19.09.2019 | NO | 19.09.2019 | GR | 20.09.2019 | IS | 19.10.2019 | LU | 24.10.2019 | SK | 24.10.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
CY | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
MT | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
LU | 24.10.2019 | ||
SK | 24.10.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
CY | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
LU | 24.10.2019 | ||
SK | 24.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
LU | 24.10.2019 | ||
SK | 24.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
LU | 24.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
LU | 24.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | LT | 19.06.2019 | |
NO | 19.09.2019 | Cited in | Examination | WO2010056328 | WO2011143499 | WO2012064369 | by applicant | US4016043 | US4018653 | US4275149 | US4318980 | US4424279 | US4737456 | US6224893 | US6283761 | US6306406 | US6346274 | US2002051808 | US2002182254 | US6576019 | US6991652 | US2007276507 | US7563822 | WO2010056328 | US2010131075 | US2011053157 | US2011117162 | WO2012064369 | WO2011US35058 | WO2011US36347 | WO2011US39859 |