EP2917147 - DEVICE FOR EMPTYING CONTAINERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.04.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.07.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.05.2019 [2019/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Krones AG Böhmerwaldstrasse 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE | [2015/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOBIECH, Bernd Böhmerwaldstraße 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE | 02 /
GROSCH, Sabine Böhmerwaldstraße 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE | [2015/38] | Representative(s) | Bittner, Bernhard Hannke Bittner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Prüfeninger Strasse 1 93049 Regensburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/38] | Bittner, Bernhard Hannke Bittner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Prüfeninger Strasse 1 93049 Regensburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 13786498.9 | 06.11.2013 | [2015/38] | WO2013EP73194 | Priority number, date | DE201210110600 | 06.11.2012 Original published format: DE102012110600 | [2015/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014072359 | Date: | 15.05.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2917147 | Date: | 16.09.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.05.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B67D1/00 | [2015/38] | CPC: |
B67D1/0001 (EP,US);
B67D1/00 (RU);
B65B69/005 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/38] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM ENTLEEREN VON BEHÄLTNISSEN | [2015/38] | English: | DEVICE FOR EMPTYING CONTAINERS | [2015/38] | French: | DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE VIDER DES RÉCIPIENTS | [2015/38] | Entry into regional phase | 08.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 08.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/38] | 25.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/22] | 10.01.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/22] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.02.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2018 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE1108102 (EWALD GOLDMANN); | [X]GB2186544 (CHEMENCE LTD); | [A]WO9208670 (DU PONT CANADA [CA]); | [A]US5240144 (FELDMAN JOSEPH [IL]); | [A]US5505336 (MONTGOMERY MICHAEL W [US], et al); | [X]EP0820958 (LUCKHARDT OHG [DE]); | [X]WO0142090 (PERNA PTY LTD [AU], et al); | [X]GB2436828 (JOSEPHIDOU MARIOS [GB]) | Examination | WO2015031902 | by applicant | DE102007054431 |