EP2906106 - SYSTEMS, METHODS, AND APPARATUS FOR IMAGING OF DIFFUSE MEDIA FEATURING CROSS-MODALITY WEIGHTING OF FLUORESCENT AND BIOLUMINESCENT SOURCES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 09.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.01.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VisEn Medical, Inc. 940 Winter Street Waltham, MA 02451 / US | [2023/24] |
Former [2015/34] | For all designated states VisEn Medical, Inc. 940 Winter Street Waltham, MA 02451 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YARED, Wael 22 Hastings Road Lexington, Massachusetts 02421 / US | 02 /
KEMPNER, Joshua 167 Woburn Street Reading, Massachusetts 01867 / US | 03 /
RIPOLL LORENZO, Jorge Calle Mayor 18 28013 Madrid / ES | 04 /
ARRANZ, Alicia Calle Albaida, 84, 4ºA 28037 Madrid / ES | [2023/24] |
Former [2015/34] | 01 /
YARED, Wael 22 Hastings Road Lexington, Massachusetts 02421 / US | ||
02 /
KEMPNER, Joshua 167 Woburn Street Reading, Massachusetts 01867 / US | |||
03 /
RIPOLL LORENZO, Jorge Calle Mayor 18 E-28013 Madrid / ES | |||
04 /
ARRANZ, Alicia Calle Albaida, 84, 4ºA 28037 Madrid / ES | Representative(s) | Wilson, Justin Scott Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [2023/24] |
Former [2015/34] | Kirkham, Nicholas Andrew, et al Graham Watt & Co. LLP St. Botolph's House 7-9 St. Botolph's Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 13786565.5 | 15.10.2013 | [2015/34] | WO2013US65107 | Priority number, date | US201261714198P | 15.10.2012 Original published format: US 201261714198 P | [2015/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014062716 | Date: | 24.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2906106 | Date: | 19.08.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.04.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2906106 | Date: | 14.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00 | [2015/34] | CPC: |
A61B5/0071 (EP,CN,US);
A61B5/0073 (EP,CN,US);
A61B5/061 (CN,US);
A61B5/7214 (EP,CN,US);
A61K49/0017 (CN,US);
G01N21/6456 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME, VERFAHREN, UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ABBILDUNG VON DIFFUSEN MEDIEN MIT MODALITÄTSÜBERGREIFENDER GEWICHTUNG VON FLUORESZIERENDEN UND BIOLUMINESZIERENDEN QUELLEN | [2015/34] | English: | SYSTEMS, METHODS, AND APPARATUS FOR IMAGING OF DIFFUSE MEDIA FEATURING CROSS-MODALITY WEIGHTING OF FLUORESCENT AND BIOLUMINESCENT SOURCES | [2015/34] | French: | SYSTÈMES, PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREIL D'IMAGERIE DE MILIEU DE DIFFUSION COMPORTANT UNE PONDÉRATION ENTRE MODALITÉS DE SOURCES FLUORESCENTES ET BIOLUMINESCENTES | [2015/34] | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.2015 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/34] | 21.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.11.2022 | 15.11.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 10.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 09.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.10.2018 | Opposition(s) | 15.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.06.2023 | CZ | 14.06.2023 | DK | 14.06.2023 | EE | 14.06.2023 | ES | 14.06.2023 | FI | 14.06.2023 | HR | 14.06.2023 | IT | 14.06.2023 | LT | 14.06.2023 | LV | 14.06.2023 | MC | 14.06.2023 | PL | 14.06.2023 | RO | 14.06.2023 | RS | 14.06.2023 | SE | 14.06.2023 | SI | 14.06.2023 | SK | 14.06.2023 | SM | 14.06.2023 | NO | 14.09.2023 | GR | 15.09.2023 | IS | 14.10.2023 | LU | 15.10.2023 | PT | 16.10.2023 | CH | 31.10.2023 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/30] | AT | 14.06.2023 | |
CZ | 14.06.2023 | ||
DK | 14.06.2023 | ||
EE | 14.06.2023 | ||
ES | 14.06.2023 | ||
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
IT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
MC | 14.06.2023 | ||
PL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RO | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SI | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
IS | 14.10.2023 | ||
LU | 15.10.2023 | ||
PT | 16.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | AT | 14.06.2023 | |
CZ | 14.06.2023 | ||
DK | 14.06.2023 | ||
EE | 14.06.2023 | ||
ES | 14.06.2023 | ||
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
IT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
MC | 14.06.2023 | ||
PL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RO | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SI | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
IS | 14.10.2023 | ||
PT | 16.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 14.06.2023 | |
CZ | 14.06.2023 | ||
DK | 14.06.2023 | ||
EE | 14.06.2023 | ||
ES | 14.06.2023 | ||
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
IT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
PL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RO | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SI | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
IS | 14.10.2023 | ||
PT | 16.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 14.06.2023 | |
CZ | 14.06.2023 | ||
DK | 14.06.2023 | ||
EE | 14.06.2023 | ||
ES | 14.06.2023 | ||
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
PL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RO | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SI | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
IS | 14.10.2023 | ||
PT | 16.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 14.06.2023 | |
CZ | 14.06.2023 | ||
DK | 14.06.2023 | ||
EE | 14.06.2023 | ||
ES | 14.06.2023 | ||
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
PL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RO | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
IS | 14.10.2023 | ||
PT | 16.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 14.06.2023 | |
CZ | 14.06.2023 | ||
EE | 14.06.2023 | ||
ES | 14.06.2023 | ||
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
PL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RO | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
IS | 14.10.2023 | ||
PT | 16.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 14.06.2023 | |
CZ | 14.06.2023 | ||
ES | 14.06.2023 | ||
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
IS | 14.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 14.06.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XA]WO2006062895 (CAMBRIDGE RES AND INSTRUMENTAT [US], et al) [X] 55,58 * abstract * * paragraphs [0070] , [ 113] - [0116] - [ 136] - [0149] - [0184]; figures 2,6,17 * [A] 56,57; | [XA]WO2006063246 (GEN HOSPITAL CORP [US], et al) [X] 55,58 * abstract * * paragraphs [0010] - [0022] - [0063] - [0069]; figure 1 * [A] 56,57; | [X]WO2011025950 (VISEN MEDICAL INC [US], et al) [X] 55-58 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] - [0039] - [0070] - [0081] - [0095]; figures 1,2,5-8 *; | [XA] - JAE YOUN HWANG ET AL, "A Multimode Optical Imaging System for Preclinical Applications: Technology Development, Multiscale Imaging, and Chemotherapy Assessment", MOLECULAR IMAGING AND BIOLOGY, SPRINGER-VERLAG, NE, (20110827), vol. 14, no. 4, doi:10.1007/S11307-011-0517-Z, ISSN 1860-2002, pages 431 - 442, XP035086875 [X] 55,58 * abstract * * page 1, column 1, paragraph 1 - page 2, column 2, paragraph 3; figures 1-3,5 * [A] 56,57 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11307-011-0517-z | [A] - YUSUKE INOUE ET AL, "In vivo fluorescence imaging of the reticuloendothelial system using quantum dots in combination with bioluminescent tumour monitoring", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF NUCLEAR MEDICINE AND MOLECULAR IMAGING, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20070921), vol. 34, no. 12, doi:10.1007/S00259-007-0583-2, ISSN 1619-7089, pages 2048 - 2056, XP019560977 [A] 55-58 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00259-007-0583-2 | by applicant | US4981977 | US5268486 | US5486616 | WO9617628 | US5569587 | US5569766 | US5627027 | WO9740104 | US5808044 | WO9847538 | US5877310 | WO9951702 | US6002003 | US6004536 | US6008373 | US6043025 | WO0016810 | US6127134 | US6130094 | US6133445 | US6136612 | EP1065250 | WO0121624 | WO0143781 | US6448008 | EP1237583 | US6534041 | EP0796111 | US6615063 | EP1113822 | WO03074091 | US6747159 | EP1181940 | US2005283071 | EP1679082 | WO2006072580 | EP0988060 | EP1833513 | US2007238957 | EP1480683 | US7383076 | US7445767 | US7473415 | US7488468 | US7547721 | US2011071388 | US8170651 | US8190241 | US8401618 | US8401619 | US2013114069 | - DRAGAVON ET AL., PROC. OF SPIE, (2010), vol. 7902 | - GIEPMANS ET AL., SCIENCE, (2006), vol. 312, pages 217 - 224 | - SHANER ET AL., NATURE METHODS, (2005), vol. 2, pages 905 - 909 | - ZHANG ET AL., NAT. REV. MOL. BIOL., (2002), vol. 3, pages 906 - 918 | - AI ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (2007), vol. 46, pages 5904 - 5910 | - SHANER ET AL., NAT. BIOTECH, (2004), vol. 22, pages 1567 - 1572 | - CAMPBELL ET AL., PROC. NAT. ACAD. SCI., (2002), vol. 99, pages 7877 - 7882 | - HEIKAL ET AL., PROC. NAT. ACAD. SCI., (2000), vol. 97, pages 11996 - 12001 | - BAIRD ET AL., PROC. NAT. ACAD. SCI., (2000), vol. 97, pages 11984 - 11989 | - TSIEN, ANN. REV. BIOCHEM., (1998), vol. 67, pages 509 - 44 | - HEIM ET AL., CURR. BIOL., (1996), vol. 6, pages 178 - 182 | - CUBITT ET AL., TRENDS BIOCHEM SCI., (1995), vol. 11, pages 448 - 455 | - HEIM ET AL., PROC. NAT. ACAD. SCI, (1994), vol. 91, pages 12501 - 12504 | - WEISSLEDER ET AL., NATURE BIOTECH., (1999), vol. 17, pages 375 - 378 | - BREMER ET AL., NATURE MED., (2001), vol. 7, pages 743 - 748 | - CAMPO ET AL., PHOTOCHEM. PHOTOBIOL., (2007), vol. 83, pages 958 - 965 | - TYAGI ET AL., NAT. BIOTECHNOL., (2000), vol. 18, pages 1191 - 1196 | - TYAGI ET AL., NAT. BIOTECHNOL., (1998), vol. 16, pages 49 - 53 | - ACHILEFU ET AL., INVEST. RADIOL., (2000), vol. 35, pages 479 - 485 | - BECKER ET AL., NATURE BIOTECH., (2001), vol. 19, pages 327 - 331 | - BUJAI ET AL., J. BIOMED. OPT., (2001), vol. 6, pages 122 - 133 | - BALLOU ET AL., BIOTECHNOL. PROG., (1997), vol. 13, pages 649 - 658 | - NERI ET AL., NATURE BIOTECH., (1997), vol. 15, pages 1271 - 1275 | - TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (2000), vol. 41, pages 9185 - 88 |