EP2849108 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR SECURING PRINTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.01.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.02.2017 [2017/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fasoo. Com Co., Ltd 17th Fl. Business Center Nuritkum Square 1605 Sangam-dong Mapo-gu Seoul 121-270 / KR | [2015/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANG, Pil-Gu 101- 501 Sunny house Jangasan-ro 199beon-gil Namdong-gu Incheon 405-260 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Kwang-Hoon 1401 Bokwang Dream Apt. Gayang 3-dong Gangseo-gu Seoul 157-203 / KR | 03 /
YI, Nam-Su 102-1304 Prugio Apt. 228 bunji Hawolgok-dong Seongbuk-gu Seoul 136-130 / KR | [2015/12] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/12] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13787170.3 | 28.03.2013 | WO2013KR02582 | Priority number, date | KR20120047859 | 07.05.2012 Original published format: KR 20120047859 | [2015/12] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013168893 | Date: | 14.11.2013 | Language: | KO | [2013/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2849108 | Date: | 18.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 14.11.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/00, G06F3/12 | [2015/12] | CPC: |
G06F21/00 (KR);
G06F21/608 (EP,US);
G06F3/12 (KR);
G06F3/1222 (EP,US);
G06F3/1238 (EP,US);
G06F3/1243 (US);
G06F3/1285 (EP,US);
G06K15/1807 (US);
G06K15/1822 (US);
G06K15/4095 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/12] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR SICHERUNG VON DRUCKEN | [2015/12] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR SECURING PRINTING | [2015/12] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ POUR SÉCURISER UNE IMPRESSION | [2015/12] | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.2014 | Translation filed | 26.11.2014 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.2014 | Search fee paid | 26.11.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/12] | 02.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/06] | 23.09.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2009037980 (KUBO SHUSAKU [JP]) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0147] * * figures 1-14 * | International search | [Y]KR20110119988 (KYONGGI UNIVERSITY INDUSTRY & AMP ACADEMIA COOPERATION FOUNDATION [KR]); | [Y]KR20070013500 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [A]KR101129384B (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.); | [A]KR100368813B (SAPA SOFT INC.) | by applicant | KR20110027031 | KR100990269B |