EP2847590 - CELL WALL PROTEIN CWPV (CD0514) AS A DIAGNOSTIC MARKER FOR CLOSTRIDIUM DIFFICILE RIBOTYPE 027 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.02.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TechLab, Inc. 2001 Kraft Drive Blacksburg, VA 24060 / US | [2015/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAVIS, Manli, Y. 1650 Sleepy Hollow Road Christiansburg, VA 24073 / US | 02 /
WILLIAMS, Krista, A. 3007 Wakefield Drive Blacksburg, VA 24060 / US | 03 /
BROWNING, Jocelyn, N. 777 Triangle Street Apt. 316 Blacksburg, VA 24060 / US | 04 /
LYERLY, David, M. 204 Macarthur Avenue Radford, VA 24142 / US | [2015/12] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/12] | Fyfe, Fiona Allison Watson Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 13787811.2 | 09.05.2013 | [2017/14] | WO2013US40399 | Priority number, date | US201261645964P | 11.05.2012 Original published format: US 201261645964 P | US201313889670 | 08.05.2013 Original published format: US201313889670 | [2015/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013170065 | Date: | 14.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2847590 | Date: | 18.03.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2847590 | Date: | 05.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.11.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/569, G01N33/68, G01N33/53, G01N33/50 | [2015/48] | CPC: |
C12Q1/689 (EP,US);
G01N33/56911 (EP,US);
G01N2333/33 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/12] | G01N33/569, G01N33/68, G01N33/53 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZELLMEMBRANPROTEIN CWPV (CD0514) ALS DIAGNOSTISCHER MARKER FÜR CLOSTRIDIUM DIFFICILE VOM RIBOTYP 027 | [2015/12] | English: | CELL WALL PROTEIN CWPV (CD0514) AS A DIAGNOSTIC MARKER FOR CLOSTRIDIUM DIFFICILE RIBOTYPE 027 | [2015/12] | French: | PROTÉINE DE PAROI CELLULAIRE CWPV (CD0514) UTILE COMME MARQUEUR DIAGNOSTIQUE POUR LE RIBOTYPE 027 DE CLOSTRIDIUM DIFFICILE | [2015/12] | Entry into regional phase | 31.10.2014 | National basic fee paid | 31.10.2014 | Search fee paid | 31.10.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.10.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.10.2014 | Examination requested [2015/12] | 09.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 11.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 24.01.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.02.2017 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 27.02.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.07.2016 | Opposition(s) | 08.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.05.2013 | AL | 05.04.2017 | AT | 05.04.2017 | CY | 05.04.2017 | CZ | 05.04.2017 | DK | 05.04.2017 | EE | 05.04.2017 | FI | 05.04.2017 | HR | 05.04.2017 | LT | 05.04.2017 | LV | 05.04.2017 | MC | 05.04.2017 | MK | 05.04.2017 | NL | 05.04.2017 | PL | 05.04.2017 | PT | 05.04.2017 | RO | 05.04.2017 | RS | 05.04.2017 | SE | 05.04.2017 | SI | 05.04.2017 | SK | 05.04.2017 | SM | 05.04.2017 | TR | 05.04.2017 | IE | 09.05.2017 | LU | 09.05.2017 | MT | 09.05.2017 | BE | 31.05.2017 | BG | 05.07.2017 | NO | 05.07.2017 | GR | 06.07.2017 | IS | 05.08.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 09.05.2013 | |
AT | 05.04.2017 | ||
CY | 05.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
MK | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PT | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
TR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IE | 09.05.2017 | ||
LU | 09.05.2017 | ||
MT | 09.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 09.05.2013 | |
AT | 05.04.2017 | ||
CY | 05.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
MK | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
TR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IE | 09.05.2017 | ||
LU | 09.05.2017 | ||
MT | 09.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 09.05.2013 | |
AT | 05.04.2017 | ||
CY | 05.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
MK | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
IE | 09.05.2017 | ||
LU | 09.05.2017 | ||
MT | 09.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/48] | HU | 09.05.2013 | |
AT | 05.04.2017 | ||
CY | 05.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
IE | 09.05.2017 | ||
LU | 09.05.2017 | ||
MT | 09.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 09.05.2013 | |
AT | 05.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
IE | 09.05.2017 | ||
LU | 09.05.2017 | ||
MT | 09.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
IE | 09.05.2017 | ||
LU | 09.05.2017 | ||
MT | 09.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
IE | 09.05.2017 | ||
LU | 09.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
IE | 09.05.2017 | ||
LU | 09.05.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/17] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
LU | 09.05.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | NL | 05.04.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2011020845 (BRAUN VEIT [DE], et al) [Y] 1-14 * paragraph [0026] *; | [Y] - CATHERINE B. REYNOLDS ET AL, "The Clostridium difficile Cell Wall Protein CwpV is Antigenically Variable between Strains, but Exhibits Conserved Aggregation-Promoting Function", PLOS PATHOGENS, (20110421), vol. 7, no. 4, doi:10.1371/journal.ppat.1002024, page e1002024, XP055172041 [Y] 1-14 * figures 3-4; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.ppat.1002024 | [A] - PIERRE RENÉ ET AL, "Comparison of eight commercial enzyme immunoassays for the detection offrom stool samples and effect of strain type", DIAGNOSTIC MICROBIOLOGY AND INFECTIOUS DISEASES, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHING CO., AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 73, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.DIAGMICROBIO.2012.01.005, ISSN 0732-8893, (20120113), pages 94 - 96, (20120117), XP028486292 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.diagmicrobio.2012.01.005 | International search | [Y]US2011020845 (BRAUN VEIT [DE], et al); | [YE]US2013130281 (DAVIS MANLI Y [US], et al); | [YP]US2012276059 (BOONE JAMES HUNTER [US], et al) | [Y] - REYNOLDS, CB. ET AL., "The Clostridium Difficile Cell Wall Protein CwpV Is Antigenically Variable Between Strains, But Exhibits Conserved Aggregation-Promoting Function.", PLOS PATHOGENS., (20110421), vol. 7, no. 4, pages 1 - 14, XP055172041 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.ppat.1002024 | [Y] - DIPERSIO, JR ET AL., "Development Of A Rapid Enzyme Immunoassay For Clostridium Difficile Toxin A And Its Use In The Diagnosis Of C. Difficile-Associated Disease.", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL MICROBIOLOGY., (199112), vol. 29, no. 12, pages 2724 - 2730, XP055172047 |