EP2847156 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION OF VANILLIN AND VANILLIN DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.12.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rhodia Operations 25, rue de Clichy 75009 Paris / FR | For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique (C.N.R.S.) 3 rue Michel-Ange 75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/12] | For all designated states Rhodia Operations 25, rue de Clichy 75009 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique (CNRS) 3, rue Michel-Ange 75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CORBET, Matthieu No. 3966 Jin Du Road Xinzhuang Industrial Zone Minhang District Shanghai 201108 / CN | 02 /
METIVIER, Pascal No. 3966 Jin Du Road Xinzhuang Industrial Zone Minhang District Shanghai 201108 / CN | 03 /
DECAMPO, Floryan No. 3966 Jin Du Road Xinzhuang Industrial Zone Minhang District Shanghai 201108 / CN | [2015/12] | Representative(s) | Menville, Laure, et al Rhodia Opérations IAM 85, avenue des frères Perret 69192 Saint-Fons / FR | [2015/12] | Application number, filing date | 13787834.4 | 06.05.2013 | WO2013CN75203 | Priority number, date | WO2012CN75131 | 07.05.2012 Original published format: PCT/CN2012/075131 | [2015/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013166946 | Date: | 14.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2847156 | Date: | 18.03.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 14.11.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C07C45/54, C07C47/58, C07C47/565, C07C47/575 | [2016/03] | CPC: |
C07C45/54 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C45/54, C07C47/565 (EP,US);
C07C45/54, C07C47/575 (EP,US);
C07C45/54, C07C47/58 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/12] | C07C45/45, C07C45/00, C07C47/56, C07C47/565, C07C47/575, C07C45/58 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/12] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON VANILLIN UND VANILLINDERIVATEN | [2015/12] | English: | PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION OF VANILLIN AND VANILLIN DERIVATIVES | [2015/12] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR LA PRODUCTION DE VANILLINE ET DE DÉRIVÉS DE VANILLINE | [2015/12] | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.2014 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.2014 | Search fee paid | 24.11.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/12] | 25.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/03] | 30.08.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2016 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD] - AGNES KÜTT ET AL, "Equilibrium Acidities of Superacids", THE JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, US, (20101217), vol. 76, no. 2, doi:10.1021/jo101409p, ISSN 0022-3263, pages 391 - 395, XP055235130 [AD] 1-15 * page 394 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo101409p | International search | [X]US5068450 (RHONE-POULENC CHIMIE) |