EP2845036 - DETERMINATION OF NEAR SURFACE GEOPHYSICAL PROPERTIES BY IMPULSIVE DISPLACEMENT EVENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.03.2018 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.04.2018 [2018/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ConocoPhillips Company 600 N. Dairy Ashford Docketing, Bldg. ML-1065 Houston, Texas 77079 / US | [2015/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EICK, Peter M. 18207 Kelly Creek Houston, Texas 77094 / US | 02 /
BREWER, Joel D. 514 Cypress Vista Houston, Texas 77094 / US | 03 /
SHAN, Shan 12406 Aliso Bend Lane Houston, TX 77041 / US | [2015/11] | Representative(s) | Simpson, Paul Christopher ConocoPhillips (U.K.) Limited Legal Floor 6, Portman House 2 Portman Street London, Greater London W1H 6DU / GB | [2015/11] | Application number, filing date | 13787885.6 | 30.04.2013 | WO2013US38920 | Priority number, date | US201261640296P | 30.04.2012 Original published format: US 201261640296 P | [2015/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013169528 | Date: | 14.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2845036 | Date: | 11.03.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.11.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01V1/00, G01V1/145, G01V1/30, // G01V1/047 | [2015/21] | CPC: |
G01V1/006 (EP,US);
G01B5/30 (US);
G01V1/145 (EP,US);
G01V1/306 (EP,US);
G01V1/005 (EP,US);
G01V1/047 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/11] | G01V1/37 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/11] | Title | German: | BESTIMMUNG OBERFLÄCHENNAHER GEOPHYSIKALISCHER EIGENSCHAFTEN DURCH IMPULSVERSCHIEBUNGSEREIGNISSE | [2015/11] | English: | DETERMINATION OF NEAR SURFACE GEOPHYSICAL PROPERTIES BY IMPULSIVE DISPLACEMENT EVENTS | [2015/11] | French: | DÉTERMINATION DE PROPRIÉTÉS GÉOPHYSIQUES PRÈS DE LA SURFACE PAR DES ÉVÉNEMENTS DE DÉPLACEMENT IMPULSIONNEL | [2015/11] | Entry into regional phase | 01.12.2014 | National basic fee paid | 01.12.2014 | Search fee paid | 01.12.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.12.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/11] | 05.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/17] | 22.12.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2017 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2005041527 (AL-ALI MUSTAFA NASER [SA]) [Y] 1,4-6,8-11,13-15 * paragraphs [0007] - [0008] - [0 30] , [0 38] , [0 52]; figure 2 * [A] 2,3,7,12; | [A]US2008173104 (GERMAN PETER THOMAS [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0003] , [ 0036] - [0037] - [ 0064] - [0065] - [ 0243]; figures 14A, 14B *; | [YA]US2010157734 (SITTON GARY A [US], et al) [Y] 1,4-6,8-11,13-15 * paragraphs [0003] , [0 07] , [0 10] , [0 23] , [0 29] , [0 33] , [0 35] , [0 38] , [0 41] - [0046] - [0 64] - [0068] - [0 71]; figures 4, 7 * [A] 2,3,7,12; | [A]US2010232260 (ZOWARKA RAY [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0102] , [ 110]; figures 1, 13A *; | [A]US2011103186 (KRUMHANSL PETER [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A] - ROBERT LEY ET AL, "Ground viscosity and stiffness measurements for near surface seismic velocity", GEOPHYSICAL PROSPECTING, (20061101), vol. 54, no. 6, doi:10.1111/j.1365-2478.2006.00574.x, ISSN 0016-8025, pages 751 - 762, XP055181151 [A] 1-15 * page 752, column 1, paragraph 3; figures 10-14 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2478.2006.00574.x | International search | [Y]US2005267695 (GERMAN PETER T [US]); | [Y]US2009073807 (SITTON GARY A [US], et al); | [A]US2010232260 (ZOWARKA RAY [US], et al); | [A] - A. YAHYA ET AL., "Precision System For Mapping Terrain Trafficability, Tractor-Implement Performance And Tillage Quality", THE INSTITUTE OF ENGINEERS, MAYLASIA, (20061204), vol. 67, XP055157351 |