EP2849632 - CLINICAL DIAGNOSTIC SYSTEM INCLUDING INSTRUMENT AND CARTRIDGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.06.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.07.2017 [2017/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Defined Diagnostics, LLC 930 Clopper Road Gaithersburg, MD 20878 / US | [2017/09] |
Former [2015/13] | For all designated states Wellstat Diagnostics, LLC 930 Clopper Road Gaithersburg, MD 20878 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COOK, Richard, Alan 6912 Tennyson Terrace Derwood, MD 20855 / US | 02 /
CHO, Sang 811 Royal Crescent Rockville, MD 20850 / US | 03 /
DAVIS, Charles, Quentin 3621 Byron Circle Frederick, MD 21704 / US | 04 /
DORSEY, Kevin, E. Po Box 1211 Germantown, MD 20875-1211 / US | 05 /
HARLEY, Jason, Charles 8237 Cambourne Court Gaithersburg, MD 20877 / US | 06 /
LELAND, Jonathan 19508 Pine Cone Court Gaithersburg, MD 20879 / US | 07 /
MATIKYAN, Rober, Krikor 9220 Falls Chapel Way Potomac, MD 20854 / US | 08 /
OTTEN, Sjef 20011 Mattingly Terrace Gaithersburg, MD 20879 / US | 09 /
PETERMAN, Jeffrey, Howard 1505 Castle Cliff Place Silver Spring, MD 20904 / US | 10 /
THOMAS, Brian, B. 2617 Island Cove Boulevard Frederick, MD 21701 / US | [2015/13] | Representative(s) | Titmus, Craig Edward, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/13] | MacLean, Martin Robert, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | Application number, filing date | 13790062.7 | 15.05.2013 | WO2013US41252 | Priority number, date | US201261647272P | 15.05.2012 Original published format: US 201261647272 P | WO2012US67041 | 29.11.2012 Original published format: PCT/US2012/067041 | US201313844527 | 15.03.2013 Original published format: US201313844527 | US201313844450 | 15.03.2013 Original published format: US201313844450 | [2015/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013173524 | Date: | 21.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2849632 | Date: | 25.03.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.11.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.02.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B01L3/00, G01N35/10, G01N33/536, G01N33/543, G01N33/58, // G01N21/76, G01N27/327 | [2016/03] | CPC: |
F04B49/065 (EP,US);
G01N27/3273 (EP,CN,US);
B01L3/527 (US);
B65B1/04 (US);
B65B3/04 (US);
B65B5/04 (US);
B65B55/00 (US);
F04B49/106 (EP,US);
G01N21/66 (US);
G01N21/76 (CN);
G01N33/50 (US);
G01N33/536 (EP,CN,US);
G01N33/543 (EP,CN,US);
G01N33/58 (EP,CN,US);
G01N33/582 (EP,CN,US);
G01N35/00722 (CN);
G01N35/0098 (CN);
G01N35/1079 (EP,CN,US);
H05B1/025 (US);
B01L2200/10 (US);
B01L2200/16 (US);
B01L2300/042 (US);
B01L2300/0861 (US);
B01L2300/105 (US);
|
Former IPC [2015/13] | A61B5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/13] | Title | German: | KLINISCHES DIAGNOSTISCHE SYSTEM MIT INSTRUMENT UND KARTUSCHE | [2015/13] | English: | CLINICAL DIAGNOSTIC SYSTEM INCLUDING INSTRUMENT AND CARTRIDGE | [2015/13] | French: | SYSTÈME DE DIAGNOSTIC CLINIQUE COMPRENANT UN INSTRUMENT ET UNE CARTOUCHE | [2015/13] | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2014 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2014 | Search fee paid | 15.12.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/13] | 02.09.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 11.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.06.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/30] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 11.11.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 11.11.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.11.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0962773 (JONES MARK HOWARD [FR]) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0114] * * paragraph [0127] - paragraph [0132] ** figure 1 *; | [Y]WO0072970 (CEPHEID [US]) [Y] 1-12 * page 6, line 19 - page 10, line 18 * * page 30, line 9 - line 30 * * page 36, line 23 - line 36 * * page 63, line 30 - page 66, line 7 * * figures 1-4, 10, 21 *; | [A]US2002045243 (LASKA RONALD C [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0067] * * figures 1-6 *; | [Y]US2010180980 (LEE MARTIN ALAN [GB], et al) [Y] 1-12 * paragraph [0088] - paragraph [0114] * * figures 1-8 * | International search | [Y]US6656428 (CLARK DAVID D [US], et al); | [X]US2007031283 (DAVIS CHARLES Q [US], et al); | [Y]US2009246076 (KUMAR SUDEEP M [US], et al); | [Y]US2012115213 (HOFSTADLER STEVEN A [US], et al) |