EP2916872 - RECOGNITION TAGS FOR TGASE-MEDIATED CONJUGATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.01.2020 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.01.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.09.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Innate Pharma 117, Avenue de Luminy 13009 Marseille / FR | For all designated states Paul Scherrer Institut 5232 Villigen PSI / CH | [2019/09] |
Former [2015/38] | For all designated states Innate Pharma 117, Avenue de Luminy 13009 Marseille / FR | ||
For all designated states Paul Scherrer Institut 5232 Villigen PSI / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FISCHER, Eliane Schübelbachstrasse 10 CH-8193 Eglisau / CH | 02 /
ROMAGNE, François 12 Boulevard Félibrige F-13009 Marseille / FR | 03 /
DENNLER, Patrick Alberich Zwyssigstrasse 86 CH-5430 Wettingen / CH | [2015/38] | Representative(s) | Gallois, Valérie Cabinet Becker & Associés 25, rue Louis le Grand 75002 Paris / FR | [2019/09] |
Former [2015/38] | Völlmy, Lukas Innate Pharma IP Department 117, avenue de Luminy 13009 Marseille / FR | Application number, filing date | 13791777.9 | 08.11.2013 | [2015/38] | WO2013EP73428 | Priority number, date | US201261724414P | 09.11.2012 Original published format: US 201261724414 P | [2015/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014072482 | Date: | 15.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2916872 | Date: | 16.09.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.05.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2916872 | Date: | 27.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/68 | [2018/28] | CPC: |
C12N15/1065 (EP,US);
A61K47/6889 (EP,US);
A61K47/6898 (US);
B82Y5/00 (EP,US);
C07K14/4703 (EP,US);
C12N15/1037 (EP,US);
C07K2317/22 (EP,US);
C07K2317/569 (EP,US);
C07K2317/622 (EP,US);
C07K2318/00 (US);
C07K2318/20 (EP,US);
C07K2319/41 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/38] | A61K47/48 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KENNUNGEN FÜR TGASE-VERMITTELTE KONJUGATION | [2015/38] | English: | RECOGNITION TAGS FOR TGASE-MEDIATED CONJUGATION | [2015/38] | French: | ETIQUETTES DE RECONNAISSANCE POUR LA CONJUGAISON À MÉDIATION PAR LA TGASE | [2015/38] | Entry into regional phase | 01.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 01.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/38] | 21.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.03.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 11.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 14.01.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.01.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP19157586.9 / EP3564259 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.12.2016 | Opposition(s) | 28.11.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/06] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 11.04.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 11.04.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.04.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.11.2013 | AL | 27.02.2019 | AT | 27.02.2019 | CY | 27.02.2019 | CZ | 27.02.2019 | DK | 27.02.2019 | EE | 27.02.2019 | ES | 27.02.2019 | FI | 27.02.2019 | HR | 27.02.2019 | IT | 27.02.2019 | LT | 27.02.2019 | LV | 27.02.2019 | MC | 27.02.2019 | MK | 27.02.2019 | MT | 27.02.2019 | PL | 27.02.2019 | RO | 27.02.2019 | RS | 27.02.2019 | SE | 27.02.2019 | SI | 27.02.2019 | SK | 27.02.2019 | SM | 27.02.2019 | TR | 27.02.2019 | BG | 27.05.2019 | NO | 27.05.2019 | GR | 28.05.2019 | IS | 27.06.2019 | PT | 27.06.2019 | LU | 08.11.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 08.11.2013 | |
AL | 27.02.2019 | ||
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CY | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
MC | 27.02.2019 | ||
MT | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
TR | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
LU | 08.11.2019 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 08.11.2013 | |
AL | 27.02.2019 | ||
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CY | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
MC | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
TR | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
LU | 08.11.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CY | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
MC | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
TR | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
LU | 08.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
MC | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
TR | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
LU | 08.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
TR | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
LU | 08.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
TR | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | DK | 27.02.2019 | |
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 27.02.2019 | |
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2012059882 (RINAT NEUROSCIENCE CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6,7,24,25 * paragraph [0021]; table 1 * [I] 5,8-10,26,27; | [IP]WO2013092998 (INNATE PHARMA [FR], et al) [IP] 1-10,24-27 * page 18, lines 12-23; claim 1 *; | [I] - PLAGMANN I ET AL, "Transglutaminase-catalyzed covalent multimerization of camelidae anti-human TNF single domain antibodies improves neutralizing activity", JOURNAL OF BIOTECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 142, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.JBIOTEC.2009.04.002, ISSN 0168-1656, (20090615), pages 170 - 178, (20090603), XP026149722 [I] 1-10,24-27 * figures 1-5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jbiotec.2009.04.002 | [I] - SIMONE JEGER ET AL, "Site-Specific and stoichiometric Modification of Antibodies by Bacterial Transglutaminase", vol. 49, no. 51, doi:10.1002/ANIE.201004243, ISSN 1433-7851, (20101217), pages 9995 - 9997, ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE. INTERNATIONAL EDITION, WILEY VCH VERLAG, WEINHEIM, URL: http://onlinelibrary.wiley.com/doi/10.1002/anie.201004243/pdf, (20101125), XP002695029 [I] 1-10,24-27 * figures 1-3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ANIE.201004243 | [I] - THOMAS L MINDT ET AL, "Modification of different IgG1 antibodies via glutamine and lysine using bacterial and human tissue transglutaminase", BIOCONJUGATE CHEMISTRY, ACS, WASHINGTON, DC, US, vol. 19, no. 1, doi:10.1021/BC700306N, ISSN 1043-1802, (20080101), pages 271 - 278, (20071108), XP002676805 [I] 1-10,24-27 * figures 1-7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bc700306n | [I] - SIMONE JEGER, "Site-Specific Conjugation of Tumour-Targeting Antibodies Using Transglutaminase", no. DISS. ETH 18696, (20090101), pages 51 - 85, A DISSERTATION SUBMITTED TO ETH ZURICH FOR THE DEGREE OF DOCTOR OF SCIENCES, UNIVERSITY OF BASEL, URL: http://e-collection.library.ethz.ch/eserv/eth:650/eth-650-02.pdf, XP002695030 [I] 1-10,24-27 * page 51 - page 81 * | [A] - NORIHO KAMIYA ET AL, "S-Peptide as a Potent Peptidyl Linker for Protein Cross-Linking by Microbial Transglutaminase from Streptomyces mobaraensis", BIOCONJUGATE CHEMISTRY, (20030301), vol. 14, no. 2, doi:10.1021/bc025610y, ISSN 1043-1802, pages 351 - 357, XP055095134 [A] 1-10,24-27 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bc025610y |