EP2903502 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A REAL TIME LARGE DIOPTER RANGE SEQUENTIAL WAVEFRONT SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.10.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clarity Medical Systems, Inc. 5775 West Las Positas Boulevard Pleasanton, California 94588 / US | [2015/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHOU, Yan 4325 Diavila Avenue Pleasanton, California 94588 / US | 02 /
CHEW, Bradford 805 Springbrook Drive San Ramon, California 94582 / US | 03 /
SHEA, William 151 Blue Canyon Way Martinez, CA 94553 / US | [2015/33] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/33] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13792227.4 | 06.11.2013 | [2015/33] | WO2013US68746 | Priority number, date | US201261723531P | 07.11.2012 Original published format: US 201261723531 P | [2015/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014074598 | Date: | 15.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2903502 | Date: | 12.08.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.05.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61B3/10, A61B3/103, A61B3/113, A61F9/008 | [2015/33] | CPC: |
A61B3/1015 (EP,CN);
A61B3/102 (CN);
A61B3/1035 (CN);
A61B3/112 (CN);
A61B3/113 (CN);
A61F9/008 (EP,CN);
A61F9/00825 (EP);
A61F2009/00846 (EP);
A61F2009/00848 (EP,CN);
A61F2009/00851 (EP);
A61F2009/00853 (EP);
A61F2009/0087 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/33] | Extension states | BA | 07.05.2015 | ME | 07.05.2015 | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINES SEQUENZIELLEN ECHTZEIT-WELLENFRONTSENSORS MIT GROSSEM DIOPTRIENBEREICH | [2015/33] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A REAL TIME LARGE DIOPTER RANGE SEQUENTIAL WAVEFRONT SENSOR | [2015/33] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN CAPTEUR DE FRONTS D'ONDE SÉQUENTIEL EN TEMPS RÉEL À LARGE PLAGE DE DIOPTRIES | [2015/33] | Entry into regional phase | 07.05.2015 | National basic fee paid | 07.05.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.05.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.05.2015 | Examination requested [2015/33] | 15.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/46] | 27.06.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2017 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]US2010110379 (ZHOU YAN [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5 * paragraphs [0062] - [0067] * * paragraphs [0098] - [0101] * * paragraphs [0114] , [ 117] * * figures 5, 9 * [Y] 3 [I] 4; | [Y]EP1533647 (ALCON REFRACTIVE HORIZONS INC [US]) [Y] 3 * paragraphs [0009] - [0010] * * paragraphs [0017] - [0018] * * paragraphs [0024] - [0028] *; | [A]EP1153570 (ALCON UNIVERSAL LTD [CH]) [A] 1-5 * paragraphs [0045] - [0056] *; | [A]EP1745738 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON VISION CARE [US]) [A] 1-5 * paragraphs [0006] - [0007] *; | [A]US7213919 (PERSOFF JEFFREY JONATHAN [US]) [A] 1-5 * paragraph [0035] * * figure 3 *; | [AD]US2012026466 (ZHOU YAN [US], et al) [AD] 1-5 * paragraph [0148] * | [AD] - LIANG J ET AL, "OBJECTIVE MEASUREMENT OF WAVE ABERRATIONS OF THE HUMAN EYE WITH THE USE OF A HARTMANN-SHACK WAVE-FRONT SENSOR", JOURNAL OF THE OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA A, OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, US, (19940701), vol. 11, no. 7, ISSN 1084-7529, pages 1949 - 1957, XP002064186 [AD] 1-5 * page 1949 * | [AD] - WIDIKER J J ET AL, "HIGH-SPEED SHACK-HARTMANN WAVEFRONT SENSOR DESIGN WITH COMMERCIAL OFF-THE-SHELF OPTICS", APPLIED OPTICS, OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, WASHINGTON, DC; US, (20060110), vol. 45, no. 2, doi:10.1364/AO.45.000383, ISSN 0003-6935, pages 383 - 395, XP001237452 [AD] 1-5 * page 348 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/AO.45.000383 | by applicant | US7654672 | US2012026466 | US7815310 | US7445335 | US8100530 | - J. LIANG, "Objective measurement of the wave aberrations of the human eye with the use of a Hartmann-Shack wave-front sensor", J. OPT. SOC. AM. ALL, (1994), pages 1949 - 1957 | - J. J. WIDIKER ET AL., "High-speed Shack-Hartmann wavefront sensor design with commercial off-the-shelf optics", APPLIED OPTICS, (2006), vol. 45, no. 2, pages 383 - 395 |