EP3065915 - COUPLING APPARATUS FOR TELESCOPING TUBES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.08.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Husqvarna AB Drottninggatan 2 561 82 Huskvarna / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/37] | For all designated states Husqvarna AB Drottninggatan 2 56182 Huskvarna / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOHL, Peter Von-Kleist-Straße 10 89257 Illertissen / DE | [2016/37] | Representative(s) | Finkele, Rolf Gardena Manufacturing GmbH Hans-Lorenser-Straße 40 89079 Ulm / DE | [2016/37] | Application number, filing date | 13792297.7 | 08.11.2013 | [2016/37] | WO2013EP73402 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015067317 | Date: | 14.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3065915 | Date: | 14.09.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3065915 | Date: | 06.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B25G1/04, F16B7/04 | [2016/37] | CPC: |
B25G1/04 (EP);
F16B7/042 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOPPLUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR TELESKOPROHRE | [2016/37] | English: | COUPLING APPARATUS FOR TELESCOPING TUBES | [2016/37] | French: | APPAREIL D'ACCOUPLEMENT POUR TUBES TÉLESCOPIQUES | [2016/37] | Entry into regional phase | 11.04.2016 | National basic fee paid | 11.04.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.04.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.11.2014 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/37] | 08.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.07.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.05.2017 | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.11.2013 | AL | 06.09.2017 | AT | 06.09.2017 | CY | 06.09.2017 | CZ | 06.09.2017 | DK | 06.09.2017 | EE | 06.09.2017 | ES | 06.09.2017 | HR | 06.09.2017 | IT | 06.09.2017 | LT | 06.09.2017 | LV | 06.09.2017 | MC | 06.09.2017 | MK | 06.09.2017 | NL | 06.09.2017 | PL | 06.09.2017 | PT | 06.09.2017 | RO | 06.09.2017 | RS | 06.09.2017 | SE | 06.09.2017 | SI | 06.09.2017 | SK | 06.09.2017 | SM | 06.09.2017 | TR | 06.09.2017 | IE | 08.11.2017 | LU | 08.11.2017 | MT | 08.11.2017 | BE | 30.11.2017 | CH | 30.11.2017 | LI | 30.11.2017 | BG | 06.12.2017 | NO | 06.12.2017 | GR | 07.12.2017 | IS | 06.01.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 08.11.2013 | |
AT | 06.09.2017 | ||
CY | 06.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
MK | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PT | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
TR | 06.09.2017 | ||
IE | 08.11.2017 | ||
LU | 08.11.2017 | ||
MT | 08.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | HU | 08.11.2013 | |
AT | 06.09.2017 | ||
CY | 06.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
MK | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
TR | 06.09.2017 | ||
IE | 08.11.2017 | ||
LU | 08.11.2017 | ||
MT | 08.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 08.11.2013 | |
AT | 06.09.2017 | ||
CY | 06.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
MK | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
IE | 08.11.2017 | ||
LU | 08.11.2017 | ||
MT | 08.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 08.11.2013 | |
AT | 06.09.2017 | ||
CY | 06.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
IE | 08.11.2017 | ||
LU | 08.11.2017 | ||
MT | 08.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 08.11.2013 | |
AT | 06.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
IE | 08.11.2017 | ||
LU | 08.11.2017 | ||
MT | 08.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
IE | 08.11.2017 | ||
LU | 08.11.2017 | ||
MT | 08.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
IE | 08.11.2017 | ||
LU | 08.11.2017 | ||
MT | 08.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
LU | 08.11.2017 | ||
MT | 08.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
LU | 08.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/33] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 06.09.2017 | |
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/15] | ES | 06.09.2017 | |
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | ES | 06.09.2017 | |
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | ES | 06.09.2017 | |
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | LT | 06.09.2017 | |
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 06.09.2017 | |
NO | 06.12.2017 | Cited in | International search | [XI]DE3625287 (GARDENA KRESS & KASTNER GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4,6,7,11,12,15 * columns 4,5; figure - * [I] 5; | [A]EP1523920 (UNI CHARM CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0039] - [0046] - [0087] - [0114]; figure - *; | [A]GB2413518 (HO CHENG GARDEN TOOLS CO LTD [TW]) [A] 1-15 * pages 4-6; figure - * |