17.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] |
05.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] |
06.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] |
15.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] |
18.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47] |
28.06.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31] |
09.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.12.2018 [2018/50] |
21.09.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] |
07.09.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.10.2018 [2018/41] |
03.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.09.2018 [2018/36] |
13.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] |
18.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.06.2018 [2018/25] |
23.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.03.2018 [2018/13] |
09.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.03.2018 [2018/11] |
09.02.2018 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 14.03.2018 [2018/11] |
02.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.03.2018 [2018/10] |
26.01.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.02.2018 [2018/09] |
01.12.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.01.2018 [2018/01] |
24.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.12.2017 [2017/52] |
17.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.12.2017 [2017/51] |
10.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.12.2017 [2017/50] |
03.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.12.2017 [2017/49] |
27.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.11.2017 [2017/48] |
03.03.2017 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 05.04.2017 [2017/14] |
25.02.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
25.02.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
22.02.2017 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
02.12.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.11.2016 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
18.11.2016 |
Change - inventor |
|
11.11.2016 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
13.07.2016 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
02.12.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.08.2015 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 09.09.2015 [2015/37] |
07.08.2015 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 09.09.2015 [2015/37] |
02.07.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.06.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.06.2015 |
New entry: Fee payment for extension state |
|
07.05.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
01.05.2015 |
Change - representative |
|
01.05.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.05.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.05.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.11.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|