EP2914586 - BRUTON'S TYROSINE KINASE INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.2018 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.11.2016 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pfizer Inc. 235 East 42nd Street New York, NY 10017 / US | [2015/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPRINGER, John Robert 203 Willow Park Drive Wentzville, Missouri 63385 / US | 02 /
DEVADAS, Balekudru 2175 Parasol Drive Chesterfield, Missouri 63017 / US | 03 /
GARLAND, Danny James 5522 Lamprecht Lane House Springs, Missouri 06351 / US | 04 /
GRAPPERHAUS, Margaret Lanahan 503 Trout Lane Troy, Illinois 62294 / US | 05 /
HAN, Seungil 286 Deerfield Ridge Drive Mystic, Connecticut 06355 / US | 06 /
HOCKERMAN, Susan Landis 636 Pearl Avenue Kirkwood, Missouri 63122 / US | 07 /
HUGHES, Robert Owen 8 Shadow Ridge Circle Newtown, Connecticut 06470 / US | 08 /
SAIAH, Eddine 12 Stedman Street, No. 2 Brookline, Massachusetts 02446 / US | 09 /
SCHNUTE, Mark Edward 10 Chase Path Acton, Massachusetts 01720 / US | 10 /
SELNESS, Shaun Raj 1875 Cedarmill Drive Chesterfield, Missouri 63017 / US | 11 /
WALKER, Daniel Patrick 124 Murdoch Court Augusta, Missouri 63332 / US | 12 /
WAN, Zhao-Kui 30 Sanderson Road Lexington, Massachusetts 02420 / US | 13 /
XING, Li 8 Great Rock Road Lexington, Massachusetts 02421 / US | 14 /
ZAPF, Christoph Wolfgang 48 Kinder Circle Marlborough, Massachusetts 01752 / US | 15 /
SCHMIDT, Michelle, Ann 5764 Lake Briar Drive Millstadt, Illinois 62260 / US | [2017/14] |
Former [2015/37] | 01 /
SPRINGER, John Robert 203 Willow Park Drive Wentzville, Missouri 63385 / US | ||
02 /
DEVADAS, Balekudru 2175 Parasol Drive Chesterfield, Missouri 63017 / US | |||
03 /
GARLAND, Danny James 5522 Lamprecht Lane House Springs, Missouri 06351 / US | |||
04 /
GRAPPERHAUS, Margaret Lanahan 503 Trout Lane Troy, Illinois 62294 / US | |||
05 /
HAN, Seungil 286 Deerfield Ridge Drive Mystic, Connecticut 06355 / US | |||
06 /
HOCKERMAN, Susan Landis 636 Pearl Avenue Kirkwood, Missouri 63122 / US | |||
07 /
HUGHES, Robert Owen 8 Shadow Ridge Circle Newtown, Connecticut 06470 / US | |||
08 /
SAIAH, Eddine 12 Stedman Street 2 Brookline, Massachusetts 02446 / US | |||
09 /
SCHNUTE, Mark Edward 10 Chase Path Acton, Massachusetts 01720 / US | |||
10 /
SELNESS, Shaun Raj 1875 Cedarmill Drive Chesterfield, Missouri 63017 / US | |||
11 /
WALKER, Daniel Patrick 124 Murdoch Court Augusta, Missouri 63332 / US | |||
12 /
WAN, Zhao-Kui 30 Sanderson Road Lexington, Massachusetts 02420 / US | |||
13 /
XING, Li 8 Great Rock Road Lexington, Massachusetts 02421 / US | |||
14 /
ZAPF, Christoph Wolfgang 48 Kinder Circle Marlborough, Massachusetts 01752 / US | |||
15 /
SCHMIDT, Michelle, Ann 5764 Lake Briar Drive Millstadt, Illinois 62260 / US | Representative(s) | Pfizer European Patent Department 23-25 avenue du Docteur Lannelongue 75668 Paris Cedex 14 / FR | [2015/37] | Application number, filing date | 13792494.0 | 01.11.2013 | [2015/37] | WO2013IB59846 | Priority number, date | US201261721920P | 02.11.2012 Original published format: US 201261721920 P | US201361772028P | 04.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361772028 P | [2015/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014068527 | Date: | 08.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2914586 | Date: | 09.09.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.05.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2914586 | Date: | 05.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/04, A61K31/4155, A61K31/454, A61P29/00, A61P35/00 | [2015/37] | CPC: |
C07D401/04 (EP,CN,US);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP,US);
A61P35/02 (EP,US);
A61P37/00 (EP,US);
A61P37/02 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/37] | Extension states | BA | 02.06.2015 | ME | 02.06.2015 | Title | German: | HEMMER DER BRUTON-TYROSINKINASE | [2015/37] | English: | BRUTON'S TYROSINE KINASE INHIBITORS | [2015/37] | French: | INHIBITEURS DE LA TYROSINE KINASE DE BRUTON | [2015/37] | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/37] | 14.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 24.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.02.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.07.2016 | Opposition(s) | 08.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.11.2013 | AL | 05.04.2017 | AT | 05.04.2017 | CY | 05.04.2017 | CZ | 05.04.2017 | DK | 05.04.2017 | EE | 05.04.2017 | FI | 05.04.2017 | HR | 05.04.2017 | LT | 05.04.2017 | LV | 05.04.2017 | MC | 05.04.2017 | MK | 05.04.2017 | NL | 05.04.2017 | PL | 05.04.2017 | PT | 05.04.2017 | RO | 05.04.2017 | RS | 05.04.2017 | SE | 05.04.2017 | SI | 05.04.2017 | SK | 05.04.2017 | SM | 05.04.2017 | TR | 05.04.2017 | BG | 05.07.2017 | NO | 05.07.2017 | GR | 06.07.2017 | IS | 05.08.2017 | LU | 01.11.2017 | MT | 01.11.2017 | BE | 30.11.2017 | CH | 30.11.2017 | LI | 30.11.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 01.11.2013 | |
AT | 05.04.2017 | ||
CY | 05.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
MK | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PT | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
TR | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
LU | 01.11.2017 | ||
MT | 01.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 01.11.2013 | |
AT | 05.04.2017 | ||
CY | 05.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
MK | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
TR | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
LU | 01.11.2017 | ||
MT | 01.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 01.11.2013 | |
AT | 05.04.2017 | ||
CY | 05.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
MK | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
LU | 01.11.2017 | ||
MT | 01.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 01.11.2013 | |
AT | 05.04.2017 | ||
CY | 05.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
LU | 01.11.2017 | ||
MT | 01.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 01.11.2013 | |
AT | 05.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
LU | 01.11.2017 | ||
MT | 01.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
LU | 01.11.2017 | ||
MT | 01.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
LU | 01.11.2017 | ||
MT | 01.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/41] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
LU | 01.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/33] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | NL | 05.04.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2009011880 (AMGEN INC [US], et al) [A] 1-28 * page 1, paragraph [0003] * * claims 1,8 *; | [A]WO2011029046 (BIOGEN IDEC INC [US], et al) [A] 1-28 * page 1, paragraph [0002] * * claim 1 *; | [A]WO2011159857 (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO [US], et al) [A] 1-28 * page 1, paragraph [0002] ** claim 1 * | by applicant | US5033252 | US5052558 | US5323907 | US6326469 | US2012252822 | - D.M. WEIR & C.C. BLACKWELL,, Handbook of experimental immunology, UNKNOWN | - NOGRADY, Medicinal Chemistry A Biochemical Approach, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, (1985), pages 388 - 392 | - SILVERMAN, The Organic Chemistry of Drug Design and Drug Action, ACADEMIC PRESS, INC., (1992), pages 352 - 401 | - SAULNIER ET AL., BIOORGANIC AND MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, (1994), vol. 4, page 1985 | - FEDORAK ET AL., AM. J. PHYSIOL., (1995), vol. 269, pages G210 - 218 | - MCLOED ET AL., GASTROENTEROL, (1994), vol. 106, pages 405 - 413 | - HOCHHAUS ET AL., BIOMED. CHROM., (1992), vol. 6, pages 283 - 286 | - J. LARSEN; H. BUNDGAARD, INT. J. PHARMACEUTICS, (1987), vol. 37, page 87 | - J. LARSEN ET AL., INT. J. PHARMACEUTICS, (1988), vol. 47, page 103 | - SINKULA ET AL., J. PHARM. SCI., (1975), vol. 64, pages 181 - 210 | - T. HIGUCHI; V. STELLA, Pro-drugs as Novel Delivery Systems, A.C.S. SYMPOSIUM SERIES, vol. 14 | - NANDAKUMAR ET AL., AM. J. PATHOL, (2003), vol. 163, pages 1827 - 1837 | - PAGEL ET AL., CLIN CANCER RES, (2005), vol. 11, no. 13, pages 4857 - 4866 | - NISITANI ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI, USA, (1999), vol. 96, pages 2221 - 2226 | - J. ORG. CHEM., (1981), vol. 46, pages 940 - 948 |