EP3057465 - ORAL CARE IMPLEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.02.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.02.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Colgate-Palmolive Company 300 Park Avenue New York, NY 10022 / US | [2016/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, David Kyung Min 87 La Rue Lane East Brunswick, New Jersey 08816 / US | 02 /
MOSKOVICH, Robert 20 Jensen Street East Brunswick, New Jersey 08816 / US | [2016/34] | Representative(s) | Schicker, Silvia Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/34] | Schicker, Silvia Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13792559.0 | 05.11.2013 | [2016/34] | WO2013US68530 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015069220 | Date: | 14.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3057465 | Date: | 24.08.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3057465 | Date: | 28.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A46B9/04, A46B9/06, A46B15/00 | [2016/34] | CPC: |
A46B9/04 (EP,US);
A46B15/0081 (EP,US);
A46B9/06 (EP,US);
A46B2200/1066 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MUNDPFLEGEVORRICHTUNG | [2016/34] | English: | ORAL CARE IMPLEMENT | [2016/34] | French: | OUTIL DE SOIN BUCCAL | [2016/34] | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.2016 | National basic fee paid | 20.04.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/34] | 23.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.02.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.10.2017 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.11.2013 | AL | 28.03.2018 | AT | 28.03.2018 | CY | 28.03.2018 | CZ | 28.03.2018 | DK | 28.03.2018 | EE | 28.03.2018 | ES | 28.03.2018 | FI | 28.03.2018 | HR | 28.03.2018 | IT | 28.03.2018 | LT | 28.03.2018 | LV | 28.03.2018 | MC | 28.03.2018 | MK | 28.03.2018 | NL | 28.03.2018 | PL | 28.03.2018 | RO | 28.03.2018 | RS | 28.03.2018 | SE | 28.03.2018 | SI | 28.03.2018 | SK | 28.03.2018 | SM | 28.03.2018 | TR | 28.03.2018 | BG | 28.06.2018 | NO | 28.06.2018 | GR | 29.06.2018 | IS | 28.07.2018 | PT | 30.07.2018 | GB | 05.11.2018 | IE | 05.11.2018 | LU | 05.11.2018 | MT | 05.11.2018 | BE | 30.11.2018 | CH | 30.11.2018 | FR | 30.11.2018 | LI | 30.11.2018 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 05.11.2013 | |
AL | 28.03.2018 | ||
AT | 28.03.2018 | ||
CY | 28.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
MK | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SI | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
TR | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
GB | 05.11.2018 | ||
IE | 05.11.2018 | ||
LU | 05.11.2018 | ||
MT | 05.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
FR | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
AT | 28.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SI | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
TR | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
GB | 05.11.2018 | ||
IE | 05.11.2018 | ||
LU | 05.11.2018 | ||
MT | 05.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
FR | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
AT | 28.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SI | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
GB | 05.11.2018 | ||
IE | 05.11.2018 | ||
LU | 05.11.2018 | ||
MT | 05.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
FR | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
AT | 28.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SI | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
GB | 05.11.2018 | ||
IE | 05.11.2018 | ||
LU | 05.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
FR | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
AT | 28.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SI | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
IE | 05.11.2018 | ||
LU | 05.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
FR | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
AT | 28.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SI | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
IE | 05.11.2018 | ||
LU | 05.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
FR | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
AT | 28.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SI | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
IE | 05.11.2018 | ||
LU | 05.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
AT | 28.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SI | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
LU | 05.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
AT | 28.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SI | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
LU | 05.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
AT | 28.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SI | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
AT | 28.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SI | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
AT | 28.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/45] | FI | 28.03.2018 | |
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | FI | 28.03.2018 | |
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | FI | 28.03.2018 | |
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2161349 (HADDEN GILBERT E) [A] 1 * page 1, column r, lines 6-12 * * figures 1-4, 6 *; | [Y]CA2163314 (CORONET WERKE GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-51 * page 7, paragraph 4 * * figure 4d *; | [A]WO9835584 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1-45 * page 15, lines 7-9 * * figure 14 *; | [A]WO0112013 (GILLETTE CANADA [CA], et al) [A] 1 * page 13, lines 19-23 ** figures 8B, 9B *; | [A]US2003077107 (KUO YOUTI [US]) [A] 1,46-51 * figures 1a-2f *; | [Y]KR20070014929 (LG HOUSEHOLD & HEALTH CARE LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-51 * figures 1, 2 *; | [A]WO2008093300 (GILLETTE CO [US], et al) [A] 1-45 * figures 10A, 10B *; | [A]US2008201884 (VAZQUEZ JOE [US], et al) [A] 1,46-51 * paragraph [0075] * * figures 24, 25 *; | [A]EP2656815 (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO [US]) [A] 1,46-51 * paragraphs [0044] - [0046] * * figures 1, 2, 3, 5, 8 * |