EP2928878 - 5-FLUORO-N-(PYRIDIN-2-YL)PYRIDIN-2-AMINE DERIVATIVES CONTAINING A SULFOXIMINE GROUP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.09.2017 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 08.11.2017 [2017/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer Pharma Aktiengesellschaft Müllerstrasse 178 13353 Berlin / DE | [2015/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LÜCKING, Ulrich Paula-Fürst-Str. 2 10317 Berlin / DE | 02 /
BÖHNKE, Niels Sächsische Str. 41 10713 Berlin / DE | 03 /
SCHOLZ, Arne Schönhauser Allee 170 10435 Berlin / DE | 04 /
LIENAU, Philip Jahnstr. 13 10967 Berlin / DE | 05 /
SIEMEISTER, Gerhard Reimerswalder Steig 26 13503 Berlin / DE | 06 /
BÖMER, Ulf Leipziger Str. 49 16548 Glienicke / DE | 07 /
KOSEMUND, Dirk Klutstr. 14 12587 Berlin / DE | 08 /
BOHLMANN, Rolf Kühler Weg 6a 14055 Berlin / DE | 09 /
ZORN, Ludwig Osianderweg 45A 13509 Berlin / DE | [2015/42] | Representative(s) | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 50 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/42] | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | Application number, filing date | 13792885.9 | 12.11.2013 | [2015/42] | WO2013EP73637 | Priority number, date | EP20120192852 | 15.11.2012 Original published format: EP 12192852 | [2015/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014076091 | Date: | 22.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2928878 | Date: | 14.10.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2928878 | Date: | 02.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/444, C07D213/72, C07D401/12 | [2016/22] | CPC: |
A61K31/444 (EP,CN,US);
C07D213/72 (EP,CN,US);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2015/42] | C07D401/12, A61K31/44, A61P35/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/42] | Extension states | BA | 15.06.2015 | ME | 15.06.2015 | Title | German: | 5-FLUOR-N-(PYRIDIN-2-YL)PYRIDIN-2-AMIN-DERIVATE MIT EINER SULFOXIMINGRUPPE | [2016/22] | English: | 5-FLUORO-N-(PYRIDIN-2-YL)PYRIDIN-2-AMINE DERIVATIVES CONTAINING A SULFOXIMINE GROUP | [2015/42] | French: | DÉRIVÉS DE 5-FLUORO-N-(PYRIDIN-2-YL)PYRIDIN-2-AMINE CONTENANT UN GROUPE DE SULFOXIMINES | [2016/22] |
Former [2015/42] | 5-FLUOR-N-(PYRIDIN-2-YL)PYRIDIN-2-AMINDERIVATE MIT EINER SULFOXIMINGRUPPE | ||
Former [2015/42] | DÉRIVÉS DE 5-FLUORO-N-(PYRIDIN -2-YL)PYRIDIN-2-AMINES CONTENANT UN GROUPE SULFOXIMINE | Entry into regional phase | 15.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 15.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/42] | 01.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.05.2016 | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SM | 02.11.2016 | [2017/45] | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO2012117059 (LEAD DISCOVERY CENTER GMBH [DE], et al) [AD] 1-20* examples G1-G3; table 4 * |