EP2852499 - FLUID APPLICATION SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GED Integrated Solutions, Inc. 9280 Dutton Drive Twinsburg, Ohio 44087 / US | [2015/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PERSONS, Matthew 691 Castle Boulevard Akron, Ohio 44313 / US | 02 /
NOVIK, Michael 3812 Ellendale Road Moreland Hills, Ohio 44022 / US | 03 /
MCGLINCHY, Timothy 9268 Wallingford Drive Twinsburg, Ohio 44087 / US | [2015/14] | Representative(s) | Wilson Gunn Blackfriars House The Parsonage 5th Floor Manchester M3 2JA / GB | [2015/14] | Application number, filing date | 13793101.0 | 21.05.2013 | WO2013US41973 | Priority number, date | US201261649545P | 21.05.2012 Original published format: US 201261649545 P | US201313897565 | 20.05.2013 Original published format: US201313897565 | [2015/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013177128 | Date: | 28.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2852499 | Date: | 01.04.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.11.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.11.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B41J11/00, B41J3/28, B41J11/06 | [2016/43] | CPC: |
B41J3/40731 (EP);
B41J25/001 (US);
B41J11/007 (EP,US);
B41J11/06 (EP,US);
B41J3/28 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/14] | B41N3/03 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/14] | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGKEITSAUFTRAGSSYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN | [2015/14] | English: | FLUID APPLICATION SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2015/14] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'APPLICATION DE FLUIDE | [2015/14] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2014 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2014 | Search fee paid | 18.12.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/14] | 04.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/31] | 09.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.02.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2019 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]GB2457098 (INCA DIGITAL PRINTERS LTD [GB]) [X] 1,13,14 * page 2 - page 5; figure 2 * [I] 2-4,10; | [XI]EP2033783 (MIMAKI ENG KK [JP]) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0063] * [I] 9; | [A]WO2008062939 (ILSUNG MEM CO LTD [KR], et al) [A] 1,2,10,13 * page 6 - page 7; figure 5 *; | [A]US4567822 (HEIDENREICH HORST [DE], et al) [A] 1-5 * page 6 - page 7; figure 5 *; | [A]EP2127889 (DAINIPPON SCREEN MFG [JP]) [A] 1-5 * paragraph [0039]; figures 8-11 * | International search | [Y]US2009090257 (FELDMAN ALON [IL], et al); | [Y]US7363856 (MOULIN MICHEL [CH]); | [Y]US3476231 (BOWER RICHARD R); | [Y]US5533445 (BILL RALPH J [US]); | [Y]US2008251354 (RUGGABER THOMAS [DE], et al); | [A]US4530287 (STICHT WALTER [AT]); | [A]US3340820 (POISSON JOSEPH O); | [A]EP0876107 (CADEX LTD [GB]) | Examination | WO2010035263 | US2005002005 | by applicant | GB2457098 | EP2033783 |