EP2855500 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR MODULATING APOLIPOPROTEIN(A) EXPRESSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.05.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.01.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.03.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.11.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.10.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.06.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.04.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ionis Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 2855 Gazelle Court Carlsbad, CA 92010 / US | [2020/27] |
Former [2016/07] | For all designated states Ionis Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 2855 Gazelle Court Carlsbad, CA 92010 / US | ||
Former [2015/15] | For all designated states Isis Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 2855 Gazelle Court Carlsbad, CA 92010 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CROOKE, Rosanne, M. 2855 Gazelle Ct. Carlsbad, CA 92010 / US | 02 /
GRAHAM, Mark, J. 2855 Gazelle Ct. Carlsbad, CA 92010 / US | 03 /
FREIER, Susan, M. 2855 Gazelle Ct. Carlsbad, CA 92010 / US | [2015/15] | Representative(s) | Bieri, Simona Roxana Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | [2020/27] |
Former [2015/15] | Chapman, Desmond Mark Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 13793955.9 | 23.05.2013 | [2020/27] | WO2013US42532 | Priority number, date | US201261651539P | 24.05.2012 Original published format: US 201261651539 P | [2015/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013177468 | Date: | 28.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/48] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2855500 | Date: | 08.04.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.11.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2855500 | Date: | 01.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.01.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/113 | [2015/51] | CPC: |
C12N15/113 (EP,IL,RU,US);
C07H21/00 (IL,KR,RU);
A61K31/7115 (IL,KR,RU);
A61K31/7125 (IL,KR,RU);
A61K48/00 (IL,KR,RU);
A61P29/00 (EP,IL);
A61P3/00 (EP,IL,RU);
A61P39/00 (IL,RU);
A61P9/00 (EP,IL,RU);
A61P9/10 (EP,IL,RU);
C07H21/02 (IL,KR,RU);
C07H21/04 (IL,KR,RU);
C12N15/00 (IL,KR,RU);
C12Y304/21007 (EP,IL,RU,US);
C12N2310/11 (EP,IL,RU,US);
C12N2310/315 (EP,IL,RU,US);
C12N2310/32 (IL,RU,US);
C12N2310/321 (IL,US);
C12N2310/3231 (IL,US);
C12N2310/3341 (EP,IL,RU,US);
C12N2310/34 (IL,US);
| C-Set: |
C12N2310/321, C12N2310/341, C12N2310/3525 (US,EP);
C12N2310/321, C12N2310/3525 (EP,US) |
Former IPC [2015/15] | C07H21/02, C07H21/04, C12P19/34 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR MODULATION DER APOLIPOPROTEIN(A)-EXPRESSION | [2015/15] | English: | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR MODULATING APOLIPOPROTEIN(A) EXPRESSION | [2015/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET COMPOSITIONS DE MODULATION DE L'EXPRESSION DE L'APOLIPOPROTÉINE(A) | [2015/15] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2014 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2014 | Search fee paid | 18.12.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/15] | 13.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.11.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 12.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 16.11.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 02.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.05.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 20.05.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.05.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP20180985.2 / EP3822352 | EP20212913.6 / EP3825403 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.04.2017 | Opposition(s) | 06.04.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/23] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 12.01.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 12.01.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 31.01.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 01.07.2020 | MC | 01.07.2020 | MK | 01.07.2020 | RS | 01.07.2020 | SM | 01.07.2020 | [2024/22] |
Former [2022/07] | AL | 01.07.2020 | |
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 01.07.2020 | |
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | RS | 01.07.2020 | |
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | RS | 01.07.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [IDA]WO2005000201 (ISIS PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [ID] 1-13 * the whole document * [A] 14,15; | [L]WO2013173789 (ISIS PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]) [L] 1-13 * table 1 *; | [E]WO2014179625 (ISIS PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]) [E] 1-15* the whole document *; | [IDA] - ESTHER MERKI ET AL, "Antisense Oligonucleotide Lowers Plasma Levels of Apolipoprotein (a) and Lipoprotein (a) in Transgenic Mice", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN COLLEGE OF CARDIOLOGY, ELSEVIER, NEW YORK, NY, US, vol. 57, no. 15, doi:10.1016/J.JACC.2010.10.052, ISSN 0735-1097, (20101018), pages 1611 - 1621, (20110226), XP028407468 [ID] 1-13 * the whole document * [A] 14,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jacc.2010.10.052 | [A] - GIUSEPPE LIPPI ET AL, "Antisense therapy in the treatment of hypercholesterolemia", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF INTERNAL MEDICINE, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 22, no. 6, doi:10.1016/J.EJIM.2011.06.015, ISSN 0953-6205, (20110629), pages 541 - 546, (20110712), XP028105485 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ejim.2011.06.015 | [AP] - MARK GRAHAM ET AL, "Antisense Inhibition of Apolipoprotein(a) in Cynomolgus Monkeys Significantly Reduces Plasma Apolipoprotein(a) Levels Without Affecting Plasminogen or Other Major Lipid Classes", CIRCULATION, (20121103), vol. 126, no. 21, page A11050, XP055226156 [AP] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]WO2010006215 (CELERA CORP [US], et al); | [A]US2011039910 (CROOKE ROSANNE M [US], et al); | [A] - KOORNNEEF, A ET AL., "APOLIPOPROTEIN B KNOCKDOWN BY AAV-DELIVERED SHRNA LOWERS PLASMA CHOLESTEROL IN MICE", MICE. MOL. THER., (20110208), vol. 19, no. 4, pages 731 - 740, XP002732021 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/MT.2011.6 | by applicant | WO9414226 | WO9839352 | US5877022 | WO9914226 | US6268490 | WO03004602 | WO03014397 | US6525191 | US6670461 | US6770748 | US2004171570 | US6794499 | WO2004106356 | WO2005000201 | WO2005021570 | US2005130923 | US7034133 | US7053207 | WO2007134181 | US2008039618 | US7399845 | WO2008101157 | US7427672 | WO2008150729 | WO2008154401 | WO2009006478 | US2009012281 | US7547684 | US7696345 | US8138328 | WO2013173789 | - KRAFT et al., Eur J Hum Genet, (19960000), vol. 4, no. 2, pages 74 - 87 | - SCHULTZ et al., PLoS One, (20100000), vol. 5, page el4328 | - BERGMARK et al., J Lipid Res, (20080000), vol. 49, pages 2230 - 2239 | - TSIMIKAS et al., Circulation, (20090000), vol. 119, no. 13, pages 1711 - 1719 | - KOSCHINSKY; MARCOVINA, Curr Opin Lipidol, (20040000), vol. 15, pages 167 - 174 | - RIFAI et al., Clin Chem, (20040000), vol. 50, pages 1364 - 1371 | - ERQOU et al., JAMA, (20090000), vol. 302, pages 412 - 423 | - KAMSTRUP et al., Circulation, (20080000), vol. 117, pages 176 - 184 | - CLARKE et al., NEJM, (20090000), vol. 361, pages 2518 - 2528 | - SOLFRIZZI et al., J Neurol Neurosurg Psychiatry, (20020000), vol. 72, pages 732 - 736 | - GRAHAM et al., Circulation, (20120000), vol. 126, no. 21, page 11050 | - MERKI et al., J Am Coll Cardiol, (20110000), vol. 57, pages 1611 - 1621 | - Arch. Int. Med., (19880000), vol. 148, pages 36 - 39 | - FREDRICKSON; LEE, Circulation, (19650000), vol. 31, pages 321 - 327 | - FREDRICKSON et al., New Eng J Med, (19670000), vol. 276, no. 1, pages 34 - 42 | - YUAN et al., CMAJ, (20070000), vol. 176, pages 1113 - 1120 | - JAMA, (20010000), vol. 285, pages 2486 - 2497 | - WOOLF et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19920000), vol. 89, pages 7305 - 7309 | - GAUTSCHI et al., J. Natl. Cancer Inst., (20010300), vol. 93, pages 463 - 471 | - MAHER; DOLNICK, Nuc. Acid. Res., (19880000), vol. 16, pages 3341 - 3358 | - "GENBANK", Database accession no. NM 005577.2 | - "GENBANK", Database accession no. NT 007422.12 | - "GENBANK", Database accession no. NT 025741.15 | - "GENBANK", Database accession no. NM 005577.1 | - ALTSCHUL et al., J. Mol. Biol., (19900000), vol. 215, page 403 410 | - ZHANG; MADDEN, Genome Res., (19970000), vol. 7, page 649 656 | - SMITH; WATERMAN, Adv. Appl. Math., (19810000), vol. 2, page 482 489 | - CHATTOPADHYAYA et al., J. Org. Chem., (20090000), vol. 74, pages 118 - 134 | - SINGH et al., Chem. Commun., (19980000), vol. 4, pages 455 - 456 | - KOSHKIN et al., Tetrahedron, (19980000), vol. 54, pages 3607 - 3630 | - WAHLESTEDT et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. U. S. A., (20000000), vol. 97, pages 5633 - 5638 | - KUMAR et al., Bioorg. Med. Chem. Lett., (19980000), vol. 8, pages 2219 - 2222 | - SINGH et al., J. Org. Chem., (19980000), vol. 63, pages 10035 - 10039 | - SRIVASTAVA et al., J. Am. Chem. Soc., (20070000), vol. 129, no. 26, pages 8362 - 8379 | - ELAYADI et al., Curr. Opinion Invest. Drugs, (20010000), vol. 2, pages 558 - 561 | - BRAASCH et al., Chem. Biol., (20010000), vol. 8, pages 1 - 7 | - ORUM et al., Curr. Opinion Mol. Ther., (20010000), vol. 3, pages 239 - 243 | - FRIEDEN et al., Nucleic Acids Research, (20030000), vol. 21, pages 6365 - 6372 | - FREIER et al., Nucleic Acids Research, (19970000), vol. 25, no. 22, pages 4429 - 4443 | - ALBAEK et al., J. Org. Chem., (20060000), vol. 71, pages 7731 - 7740 | - BAKER et al., J. Biol. Chem., (19970000), vol. 272, pages 11944 - 12000 | - MARTIN, Helv. Chim. Acta, (19950000), vol. 78, pages 486 - 504 | - ALTMANN et al., Chimia, (19960000), vol. 50, pages 168 - 176 | - ALTMANN et al., Biochem. Soc. Trans., (19960000), vol. 24, pages 630 - 637 | - ALTMANN et al., Nucleosides Nucleotides, (19970000), vol. 16, pages 917 - 926 | - LEUMANN, Bioorg. Med. Chem., (20020000), vol. 10, pages 841 - 854 | - Antisense Research and Applications, CRC Press, (19930000), pages 276 - 278 | - JONES, L.J. et al., Analytical Biochemistry, (19980000), vol. 265, pages 368 - 374 | - LIPPI et al., Clinica Chimica Acta, (20110000), vol. 412, pages 797 - 801 | - FRAZER, K.A. et al., Nat. Genet., (19950000), vol. 9, pages 424 - 431 | - "GENBANK", Database accession no. NT - 007422.12 | - "GENBANK", Database accession no. NT -007422.12 | - "GENBANK", Database accession no. XM 001098061.2 | WO1998DK00393 | US20060086231 | US20060097787 | US20080026995 | US20080026998 | US20080056564 | US20080099844 | US20090989574 |