|
06.10.2022 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.12.2021 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.2021 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.10.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.2021 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.2021 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.10.2021 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.10.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.06.2021 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.06.2021 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.06.2021 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.2021 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
30.06.2021 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
14.05.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.05.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.05.2021 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.06.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.06.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.06.2020 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2020 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.02.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.02.2020 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.06.2019 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2019 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.03.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.03.2019 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.05.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.05.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.05.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
27.04.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.04.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.04.2018 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.01.2018 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.10.2017 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.05.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.05.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.05.2017 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.04.2016 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.04.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.04.2016 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.04.2016 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.04.2016 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
15.03.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.03.2016 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2016 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.12.2015 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.12.2015 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.12.2015 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.12.2015 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.12.2015 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2015 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.2015 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.05.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.05.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.05.2015 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2015 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.01.2015 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.01.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.12.2014 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.12.2014 |
Description |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
17.12.2014 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.12.2014 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.12.2014 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
08.12.2014 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
08.12.2014 |
Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
06.10.2014 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.12.2013 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
41 |
|
28.11.2013 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.11.2013 |
Copy of the translated international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.11.2013 |
International publication pamphlet |
Search / examination |
23 |