EP2923109 - A FLYWHEEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.02.2021 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.10.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heptron International Limited Unit E/2 Sandwash Close Rainford Industrial Estate Rainford, St Helens Merseyside WA11 8LY / GB | [2020/01] |
Former [2015/40] | For all designated states Heptron Power Transmission Limited Unit 7 Knowsley Enterprise Workshops Cusson Road Kirkby, Merseyside L33 7BY / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MURPHY, Gary Heptron Power Transmission Limited Unit 7 Knowsley Enterprise Workshops Cusson Road Kirkby Merseyside L33 7BY / GB | [2015/40] | Representative(s) | Aldridge, Christopher Simon, et al Mohun Aldridge Sykes Limited 12 Park Square East Leeds LS1 2LF / GB | [2020/16] |
Former [2015/40] | Aldridge, Christopher Simon Harrison IP Box Tree House Northminster Business Park Northfield Lane York, North Yorkshire Y026 6QU / GB | Application number, filing date | 13795558.9 | 25.11.2013 | [2015/40] | WO2013GB00512 | Priority number, date | GB20120021186 | 24.11.2012 Original published format: GB 201221186 | [2015/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014080165 | Date: | 30.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2923109 | Date: | 30.09.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2923109 | Date: | 15.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F16F15/31, F16F15/315, H02K7/02 | [2015/40] | CPC: |
F16F15/3156 (EP,US);
F16F15/31 (EP,GB,US);
F16C32/0402 (US);
F16C32/0417 (EP,US);
F16C32/0444 (US);
F16C32/0455 (US);
F16C32/0474 (US);
F16C32/0476 (EP,US);
F16C39/063 (EP,US);
F16F15/315 (EP,GB,US);
H02K7/02 (US);
H02K7/025 (EP,US);
Y02E60/16 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHWUNGRAD | [2015/40] | English: | A FLYWHEEL | [2015/40] | French: | VOLANT D'INERTIE | [2015/40] | Entry into regional phase | 10.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 10.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/40] | 12.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP20169288.6 / EP3708868 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.09.2017 | Opposition(s) | 18.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2015 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.05.2016 | 30.11.2016 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   26.05.2017 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.11.2013 | AL | 15.04.2020 | AT | 15.04.2020 | CY | 15.04.2020 | CZ | 15.04.2020 | EE | 15.04.2020 | HR | 15.04.2020 | LT | 15.04.2020 | LV | 15.04.2020 | MC | 15.04.2020 | MK | 15.04.2020 | MT | 15.04.2020 | PL | 15.04.2020 | RO | 15.04.2020 | RS | 15.04.2020 | SI | 15.04.2020 | SK | 15.04.2020 | SM | 15.04.2020 | BG | 15.07.2020 | GR | 16.07.2020 | IS | 15.08.2020 | PT | 17.08.2020 | LU | 25.11.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 25.11.2013 | |
AL | 15.04.2020 | ||
AT | 15.04.2020 | ||
CY | 15.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
MT | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SI | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
LU | 25.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AL | 15.04.2020 | |
AT | 15.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SI | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
LU | 25.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 15.04.2020 | |
AT | 15.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SI | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 15.04.2020 | |
AT | 15.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SI | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 15.04.2020 | |
AT | 15.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 15.04.2020 | |
AT | 15.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 15.04.2020 | |
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | HR | 15.04.2020 | |
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | HR | 15.04.2020 | |
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | HR | 15.04.2020 | |
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | LT | 15.04.2020 | |
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 15.04.2020 | |
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 15.08.2020 | Cited in | International search | [Y]FR2356044 (BATTELLE DEVELOPMENT CORP [US]) [Y] 1-6,16,17 * page 22, line 24 - page 23, line 13; figure 12 * * page 20, line 14 - line 34 *; | [YA]NL9002415 (AUGUSTUS LENGER) [Y] 7,8,18 * abstract * * page 1, line 16 - line 18 *[A] 1-6,16,17; | [Y]GB2463534 (HEPTRON LTD [GB]) [Y] 1-6,16-18 * abstract * * page 6, line 23 - line 25 *; | [XYI]WO2012127194 (LIVERPOOL RENEWABLE ENERGY RES CT [GB], et al) [X] 9-11 * page 4, line 18 - line 25 * * page 17, line 27 - page 18, line 7; figures 1, 2 * * page 5, line 6 - line 10 * [Y] 7,8 [I] 12-15 |