EP2935219 - METHOD OF PREPARATION OF CRYSTAL FORMS OF 4-(CYCLOPROPYLMETHOXY)-N-(3,5-DICHLORO-1-OXIDOPYRIDYN-4-yl)-5-METHOXYPYRIDINE-2-CARBOXAMIDE AND CRISTAL FORMS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.04.2017 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.11.2018 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANOFI 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [2015/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BILLOT, Pascal Sanofi Patent Department 54 rue La Boétie F-75008 Paris / FR | 02 /
BRIGE, Didier Sanofi Patent Department 54 rue La Boétie F-75008 Paris / FR | 03 /
GIULIANI, Alexandre Sanofi Patent Department 54 rue La Boétie F-75008 Paris / FR | 04 /
ELMALEH, Hagit Sanofi Patent Department 54 rue La Boétie F-75008 Paris / FR | 05 /
PERRIN, Marc-Antoine Sanofi Patent Department 54 rue La Boétie F-75008 Paris / FR | [2015/44] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/44] | Tinel, Marie-Line, et al Sanofi Département Brevets 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 13796087.8 | 28.11.2013 | [2015/44] | WO2013EP74972 | Priority number, date | EP20120306479 | 28.11.2012 Original published format: EP 12306479 | [2015/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014083107 | Date: | 05.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2935219 | Date: | 28.10.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.06.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C07D213/89, A61K31/4412, A61P25/00 | [2015/44] | CPC: |
C07D213/89 (EP,CN,RU,US);
A61K31/444 (RU);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
C07B2200/13 (CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/44] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON KRISTALLFORMEN VON 4-(CYCLOPROPYLMETHOXY)N-(3,5-DICHLOR-1-OXIDOPYRIDYN-4-YL-)5-METHOXYPYRIDIN-2-CARBOXAMID UND KRISTALLFORMEN DAVON | [2015/44] | English: | METHOD OF PREPARATION OF CRYSTAL FORMS OF 4-(CYCLOPROPYLMETHOXY)-N-(3,5-DICHLORO-1-OXIDOPYRIDYN-4-yl)-5-METHOXYPYRIDINE-2-CARBOXAMIDE AND CRISTAL FORMS THEREOF | [2015/44] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE FORMES CRISTALLINES DU 4-(CYCLOPROPYLMÉTHOXY)-N-(3,5-DICHLORO-1-OXYDOPYRIDIN-4-YL)-5-MÉTHOXYPYRIDINE-2-CARBOXAMIDE ET SES FORMES CRISTALLINES | [2015/44] | Entry into regional phase | 29.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 29.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/44] | 02.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.11.2018 | 24.10.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 09.11.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.06.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [ID]WO9504045 (RHONE POULENC RORER LTD [GB], et al) [ID] 1-23 * page 30, line 26 - line 27; compound FR * * example 31 *; | [A] - CAIRA M R, "CRYSTALLINE POLYMORPHISM OF ORGANIC COMPOUNDS", TOPICS IN CURRENT CHEMISTRY, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (19980101), vol. 198, doi:10.1007/3-540-69178-2_5, ISSN 0340-1022, ISBN 978-3-540-36760-4, pages 163 - 208, XP001156954 [A] 1-23 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/3-540-69178-2_5 | Examination | - CAIRA ED - MONTCHAMP JEAN-LUC, "Crystalline Polymorphism of Organic Compounds", TOPICS IN CURRENT CHEMISTRY; [TOPICS IN CURRENT CHEMISTRY], SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (19980101), vol. 198, ISSN 0340-1022, pages 163 - 208, XP008166276 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/3-540-69178-2_5 |