EP2919495 - TERMINAL DEVICE AND CHARGE PROMPT METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.12.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.01.2019 [2019/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2015/38] | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Yi ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
FANG, Lijun ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2015/38] | Representative(s) | Lavoix Bayerstraße 83 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/38] | Tischner, Oliver Lavoix Munich Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13796916.8 | 29.07.2013 | [2015/38] | WO2013CN80311 | Priority number, date | CN201210450509 | 12.11.2012 Original published format: CN201210450509 | [2015/38] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013178175 | Date: | 05.12.2013 | Language: | ZH | [2013/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2919495 | Date: | 16.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 05.12.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/24 | [2015/38] | CPC: |
H04L12/1421 (EP,US);
H04W8/183 (US);
H04L12/1485 (EP,US);
H04M15/67 (US);
H04M15/80 (EP,US);
H04M15/8022 (EP,US);
H04M15/8038 (EP,US);
H04M15/83 (EP,US);
H04M15/8351 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/38] | Title | German: | ENDGERÄT VORRICHTUNG UND GEBÜHRENANFORDERUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2015/38] | English: | TERMINAL DEVICE AND CHARGE PROMPT METHOD THEREFOR | [2015/38] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TERMINAL ET PROCÉDÉ D'INVITATION À TÉLÉCHARGER CORRESPONDANT | [2015/38] | Entry into regional phase | 13.05.2015 | Translation filed | 13.05.2015 | National basic fee paid | 13.05.2015 | Search fee paid | 13.05.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.05.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.05.2015 | Examination requested [2015/38] | 22.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/03] | 11.09.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/03] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.04.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]KR20040066442 (LG ELECTRONICS INC) [I] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]EP1441557 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [X]US2010216439 (MARCELLI MAURIZIO [IT], et al) [X] 1-10 * figures 1-4 * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0089] *; | [A]EP2348760 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0054] * | International search | [X]KR20040066442 (LG ELECTRONICS INC); | [A]CN1867098 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [A]CN1867018 (BEIJING XINWEI TELECOM TECH CO [CN]); | [XP]CN102958031 (ZTE CORP) |