EP2856846 - BALLAST WITH BATTERY BACKUP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.01.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.02.2020 [2020/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fulham Co. Ltd. 12d Ford Glory Plaza 37-39 Wing Hong Street Cheung Sha Wan Kowloon / CN | [2015/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Xiaohong Room 402 Building 1 777 Meihua Road Shanghai 201204 / CN | 02 /
CI, David Room 613 Huiyuan 6 Zhangcun Town Huancui County Weihai Shangdon Province 264200 / CN | [2015/15] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/15] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13796941.6 | 30.05.2013 | WO2013IB01287 | Priority number, date | US201261653372P | 30.05.2012 Original published format: US 201261653372 P | [2015/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013179134 | Date: | 05.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2856846 | Date: | 08.04.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 05.12.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H05B41/295, H02J9/06 | [2015/15] | CPC: |
H02J9/065 (EP,US);
H02J9/02 (US);
H02J9/06 (US);
H05B41/2855 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/15] | Title | German: | VORSCHALTGERÄT MIT NOTSTROMBATTERIE | [2015/15] | English: | BALLAST WITH BATTERY BACKUP | [2015/15] | French: | BALLAST AVEC BATTERIE DE SECOURS | [2015/15] | Entry into regional phase | 04.12.2014 | National basic fee paid | 04.12.2014 | Search fee paid | 04.12.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.12.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/15] | 18.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/07] | 07.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/07] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.02.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3919618 (COLEMAN CHARLES E, et al) [Y] 2-14 * figure 8 *; | [XY]US4682078 (PASCALIDE CHIRIAC [US]) [X] 1,13 * figure 3 * [Y] 2-12,14,15; | [XY]GB2269062 (JSB ELECTRICAL PLC [GB]) [X] 1-6,12-14 * page 1, paragraph 3 - page 6, paragraph last; figures 1-3; claims 1-15 * * page 7, lines 1-6 * [Y] 7-11,15; | [Y]US5493181 (SHACKLE PETER W [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * figure 4 *; | [Y]EP2023463 (BAST LIGHTING CO LTD [CN]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0017] *; | [X]CN201536269U (HONG, CHONGXIANG) [X] 1,13* figures 1-5 * | International search | [A]US6040661 (BOGDAN ALEXEI [CA]); | [X]CN201536269U (HONG, CHONGXIANG) | by applicant | US3919618 | GB2269062 | US5811938 | US6876159 | US7084582 | US7880391 | US7965494 |