EP2854736 - HEMOSTASIS WOUND HEALING DEVICE FOR DYNAMIC ELASTIC INJURY SITE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.05.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.06.2018 [2018/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shih, Lih-Bin 11042 Caminito Vista Pacifica San Diego, CA 92131 / US | [2015/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2015/15] | Representative(s) | Emde, Eric Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/15] | Emde, Eric Wagner & Geyer Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13797131.3 | 27.05.2013 | WO2013US42785 | Priority number, date | US201261689073P | 29.05.2012 Original published format: US 201261689073 P | [2015/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013181118 | Date: | 05.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2854736 | Date: | 08.04.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 05.12.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/02, A61F13/00, A61F7/00 | [2015/15] | CPC: |
A61F7/02 (EP,US);
A61F7/0085 (US);
A61F13/00063 (US);
A61F7/10 (EP,US);
A61F2007/0054 (US);
A61F2007/0228 (EP,US);
A61F2007/0231 (EP,US);
A61F2007/0247 (EP,US);
A61F2007/0261 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/15] | Title | German: | HÄMOSTASEWUNDHEILVORRICHTUNG FÜR DYNAMISCHE ELASTISCHE VERLETZUNGSSTELLE | [2015/15] | English: | HEMOSTASIS WOUND HEALING DEVICE FOR DYNAMIC ELASTIC INJURY SITE | [2015/15] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR LA GUÉRISON DE BLESSURES PAR HÉMOSTASE POUR SITE DE BLESSURE ÉLASTIQUE DYNAMIQUE | [2015/15] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2014 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2014 | Search fee paid | 19.12.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/15] | 17.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.05.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3780537 (SPENCER J) [A] 8* column 1, lines 23-27 *; | [XI]US5968072 (HITE LARRY LEE [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6,7,9,10,13,14 * column 2, line 51 - column 3, line 11 * * column 4, lines 22-24 * * column 3, line 56 - column 4, line 21 * * figures 1,2 * * column 4, lines 32-39 * * column 3, lines 47-55 * [I] 5,8,11,12,15; | [XI]US2007130840 (JOUHANNET GUY [BE]) [X] 1,6-10 * paragraphs [0064] , [0090] , [0092] , [0093] , [0096] , [0103]; figures 1,2,3,6 * [I] 2,5,11,12 | International search | [X]US5968072 (HITE LARRY LEE [US], et al); | [Y]WO0139704 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al); | [A]WO2004043695 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]); | [A]US2007161932 (PICK EREZ [US], et al); | [A]US2008015665 (LACHENBRUCH CHARLES A [US]) | by applicant | US5968072 | US2007130840 |