EP2854820 - 7-DISUBSTITUTED-PHENYL TETRACYCLINE DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.01.2020 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.04.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.03.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.06.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.05.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.09.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Paratek Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 75 Park Plaza Boston, MA 02116 / US | [2018/37] |
Former [2015/15] | For all designated states Paratek Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 75 Kneeland Street Boston, MA 02111 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOWSER, Todd 88 Haggerty Road Charlton, MA 01507 / US | 02 /
ABATO, Paul 35 Forest Street Providence, RI 02906 / US | [2015/15] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2015/15] | Application number, filing date | 13797512.4 | 30.05.2013 | WO2013US43363 | Priority number, date | US201261653262P | 30.05.2012 Original published format: US 201261653262 P | [2015/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013181391 | Date: | 05.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2854820 | Date: | 08.04.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.02.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/65, C07C237/34 | [2015/48] | CPC: |
C07C237/34 (EP,US);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
C07C2603/46 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/15] | A61K31/65 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/15] | Extension states | BA | 10.12.2014 | ME | 10.12.2014 | Title | German: | 7-DISUBSTITUIERTE PHENYLTETRACYCLINDERIVATE | [2015/15] | English: | 7-DISUBSTITUTED-PHENYL TETRACYCLINE DERIVATIVES | [2015/15] | French: | DÉRIVÉS DE 7-(PHÉNYL DISUBSTITUÉ)-TÉTRACYCLINE | [2015/15] | Entry into regional phase | 10.12.2014 | National basic fee paid | 10.12.2014 | Search fee paid | 10.12.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.12.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/15] | 13.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.05.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 29.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 11.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/08] | 27.09.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/08] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.03.2017 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 27.02.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 27.02.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.03.2019 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 18.05.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 18.05.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.06.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2008127722 (PARATEK PHARM INNC [US], et al) [X] 1-26 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US7935687 (BERNIAC JOEL [US], et al); | [A]US2010305072 (KIM OAK K [US], et al); | [A]US2007155708 (NELSON MARK L [US], et al) | by applicant | - BERGE ET AL., "Pharmaceutical Salts", J. FARM. SCI., (1977), vol. 66, pages 1 - 19 | - MONANI, U.R. ET AL., "The human centromeric survival motor neuron gene (SMN2) rescues embryonic lethality in Smn (-/-) mice and results in a mouse with spinal muscular atrophy", HUM. MOL. GENET., (2000), vol. 9, no. 3, pages 333 - 9 | - LE, T.T. ET AL., HUM. MOL. GENET., (2005), vol. 14, no. 6, pages 845 - 57 |