06.09.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] |
27.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] |
19.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] |
12.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] |
29.03.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] |
19.05.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.06.2023 [2023/25] |
14.04.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.05.2023 [2023/20] |
03.02.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.03.2023 [2023/10] |
20.01.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.02.2023 [2023/08] |
06.01.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.02.2023 [2023/06] |
02.12.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.01.2023 [2023/01] |
05.08.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2022 [2022/36] |
05.08.2022 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 07.09.2022 [2022/36] |
17.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.07.2022 [2022/29] |
27.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] |
20.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.06.2022 [2022/25] |
13.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.06.2022 [2022/24] |
06.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2022 [2022/23] |
22.04.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.05.2022 [2022/21] |
18.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.03.2022 [2022/12] |
11.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.03.2022 [2022/11] |
04.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.03.2022 [2022/10] |
28.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.03.2022 [2022/09] |
21.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.02.2022 [2022/08] |
14.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.02.2022 [2022/07] |
01.09.2021 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
27.08.2021 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 29.09.2021 [2021/39] |
13.08.2021 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
13.08.2021 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
13.07.2021 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
01.06.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.04.2021 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
23.03.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
23.03.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
08.11.2020 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
14.10.2020 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
09.10.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 11.11.2020 [2020/46] |
09.10.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 11.11.2020 [2020/46] |
05.10.2020 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
05.10.2020 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
02.10.2020 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
02.10.2020 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
02.10.2020 |
Deletion: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
28.09.2020 |
Deletion: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
28.09.2020 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
12.07.2020 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
03.06.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.03.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
20.03.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
07.11.2019 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
04.06.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.06.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.06.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.01.2017 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
09.01.2017 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
09.01.2017 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
03.01.2017 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
17.10.2016 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
03.06.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.02.2016 |
Change - classification |
published on 09.03.2016 [2016/10] |
05.02.2016 |
Change - classification |
published on 09.03.2016 [2016/10] |
05.02.2016 |
Change - date of supplementary search report |
published on 09.03.2016 [2016/10] |
07.08.2015 |
Change - extension states |
published on 09.09.2015 [2015/37] |
03.06.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.03.2015 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 08.04.2015 [2015/15] |
06.03.2015 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 08.04.2015 [2015/15] |
26.02.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.02.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.12.2014 |
Change - representative |
|
23.12.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.12.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.12.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|