Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9561578 | Global Dossier | 07.02.2017 | B2 | US2015111473 | 23.04.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261654176 | 01.06.2012 | US201261705315 | 25.09.2012 | WO2013US43559 | 31.05.2013 | US201314404756 | 31.05.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104520070B | Global Dossier | 17.07.2018 | B | CN104520070 | 15.04.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261654176 | 01.06.2012 | US201261705315 | 25.09.2012 | WO2013US43559 | 31.05.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2855084 | Global Dossier | 29.09.2021 | B1 | EP2855084 | 09.03.2016 | A4 | EP2855084 | 08.04.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261654176 | 01.06.2012 | US201261705315 | 25.09.2012 | WO2013US43559 | 31.05.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IN10139DELNP2014 | 21.08.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261654176 | 01.06.2012 | US201261705315 | 25.09.2012 | WO2013US43559 | 31.05.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013181504 | Global Dossier | 05.12.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261654176 | 01.06.2012 | US201261705315 | 25.09.2012 |