Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP2920085 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

EP13798812 US2013069613W US201314077281



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9668935Global Dossier 06.06.2017B2
US2014131369 15.05.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201261726132 14.11.2012
US201314077281 12.11.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2920085Global Dossier 03.05.2017B1
EP2920085 23.09.2015A2
Priority number Date
US201261726132 14.11.2012
WO2013US69613 12.11.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2014078287Global Dossier 21.08.2014A3
WO2014078287 22.05.2014A2
Priority number Date
US201261726132 14.11.2012