|
08.07.2020 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2019 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.08.2019 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.07.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.2019 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.07.2019 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.2019 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.07.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.03.2019 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.03.2019 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.03.2019 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.2019 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
20.03.2019 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
19.11.2018 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
02.11.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.11.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.11.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.11.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.11.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.06.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.06.2018 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.04.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.04.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.04.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.04.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.03.2018 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2018 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.2017 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.10.2017 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.07.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.2017 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.04.2017 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.04.2017 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.03.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.03.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.03.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2017 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.12.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.12.2016 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.10.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.10.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.10.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2016 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.06.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.06.2016 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.05.2016 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.05.2016 |
Statement of non-availability of priority search results |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.05.2016 |
Statement of non-availability of priority search results |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2016 |
Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.03.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.03.2016 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.03.2016 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.03.2016 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.03.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.2015 |
Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2015 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.09.2015 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.09.2015 |
Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.08.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.06.2015 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.06.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.06.2015 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.04.2015 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.12.2014 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
15.12.2014 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
15.12.2014 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
15.12.2014 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
18.11.2014 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2014 |
Amendments of documents (Article 19 PCT) |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
06.11.2014 |
Reply to International Search Opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
29.10.2014 |
Grant of extension of time limit |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
29.10.2014 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
16.10.2014 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
16.10.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
16.10.2014 |
Request for extension of time limit |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
13.10.2014 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Request for extension of time limit |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
07.07.2014 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
19.06.2014 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.06.2014 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.06.2014 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
25.02.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
25.02.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
25.02.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
26.11.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
26.11.2013 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
26.11.2013 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
3 |
|
26.11.2013 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
16 |
|
26.11.2013 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
3 |