EP2923148 - LIGHTING DEVICE COMPRISING AN IMPROVED HEAT TRANSFERRING ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.09.2017 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, IS | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Philips Lighting Holding B.V. High Tech Campus 45 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2016/34] |
Former [2015/40] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEN BOER, Reinier, Imre, Anton c/o High Tech Campus 45 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
BUKKEMS, Peter, Johannes, Martinus c/o High Tech Campus 45 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
ANSEMS, Johannes, Petrus, Maria c/o High Tech Campus 45 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2017/33] |
Former [2015/40] | 01 /
DEN BOER, Reinier, Imre, Anton c/o High Tech Campus Building 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
02 /
BUKKEMS, Peter, Johannes, Martinus c/o High Tech Campus Building 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | |||
03 /
ANSEMS, Johannes, Petrus, Maria c/o High Tech Campus Building 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Representative(s) | Verweij, Petronella Daniëlle, et al Signify Netherlands B.V. Intellectual Property High Tech Campus 7 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2016/46] | Verweij, Petronella Daniëlle, et al Philips Lighting B.V. Philips Lighting Intellectual Property High Tech Campus 45 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2015/40] | Ketting, Alfred Philips International B.V. Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 13799379.6 | 18.09.2013 | [2015/40] | WO2013IB58624 | Priority number, date | US201261729661P | 26.11.2012 Original published format: US 201261729661 P | [2015/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014080301 | Date: | 30.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2923148 | Date: | 30.09.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2923148 | Date: | 16.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F21V29/70, F21K9/237, F21K9/90, F21V29/506, // F21V14/02, F21V19/00, F21Y107/40, F21Y115/10, F21V23/00, F21V3/02 | [2016/24] | CPC: |
F21V29/70 (EP,US);
F21K9/23 (EP,US);
F21K9/90 (EP,US);
F21V29/503 (US);
F21V29/507 (EP,US);
F21K9/238 (EP,US);
F21V14/02 (EP,US);
F21V19/004 (EP,US);
F21V23/005 (EP,US);
F21V29/00 (RU);
F21V29/506 (EP,US);
F21V3/02 (EP,US);
F21Y2107/40 (EP,US);
F21Y2115/10 (EP,US);
H05K1/189 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/40] | F21V29/00, F21K99/00, F21V15/01, F21V3/00, F21V14/02, F21V19/00, F21Y111/00, F21Y101/02, F21V23/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BELEUCHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT EINEN VERBESSERTEN WÄRMETRANSFERANORDNUNG | [2016/24] | English: | LIGHTING DEVICE COMPRISING AN IMPROVED HEAT TRANSFERRING ARRANGEMENT | [2015/40] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ÉCLAIRAGE COMPRENANT UN SYSTÈME DE TRANSFERT DE LA CHALEUR AMÉLIORÉ | [2016/24] |
Former [2015/40] | BELEUCHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT EINER VERBESSERTEN WÄRMELEITUNGSANORDNUNG | ||
Former [2015/40] | DISPOSITIF D'ÉCLAIRAGE COMPRENANT UN AGENCEMENT DE TRANSFERT DE CHALEUR AMÉLIORÉ | Entry into regional phase | 26.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 26.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/40] | 16.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.10.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.06.2016 | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.09.2013 | AL | 16.11.2016 | AT | 16.11.2016 | BE | 16.11.2016 | CY | 16.11.2016 | CZ | 16.11.2016 | DK | 16.11.2016 | EE | 16.11.2016 | ES | 16.11.2016 | FI | 16.11.2016 | HR | 16.11.2016 | IT | 16.11.2016 | LT | 16.11.2016 | LV | 16.11.2016 | MC | 16.11.2016 | MK | 16.11.2016 | NL | 16.11.2016 | PL | 16.11.2016 | RO | 16.11.2016 | RS | 16.11.2016 | SE | 16.11.2016 | SI | 16.11.2016 | SK | 16.11.2016 | SM | 16.11.2016 | TR | 16.11.2016 | BG | 16.02.2017 | NO | 16.02.2017 | GR | 17.02.2017 | IS | 16.03.2017 | PT | 16.03.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 18.09.2013 | |
AT | 16.11.2016 | ||
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CY | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
IT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
MC | 16.11.2016 | ||
MK | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
TR | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 18.09.2013 | |
AT | 16.11.2016 | ||
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CY | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
IT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
MC | 16.11.2016 | ||
MK | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 18.09.2013 | |
AT | 16.11.2016 | ||
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CY | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
IT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
MC | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 18.09.2013 | |
AT | 16.11.2016 | ||
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
IT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
MC | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/30] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
IT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
MC | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
IT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
IT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
IT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 16.11.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2005024875 (ZHANG LONG BAO [US]) [A] 1,3,12 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0038] * * figures 1-3 *; | [Y]US7121687 (SIDWELL STEVEN [US], et al) [Y] 1,3-5,7,10-12,14 * column 2, line 15 - line 64 * * figures 1-4 *; | [YA]DE202009017104U (LEE HAN MING [TW]) [Y] 1,3-5,7,10-12,14 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0004] * * figures 2-6 * [A] 2; | [A]US2010103667 (THRAILKILL JOHN E [US]) [A] 1,3,4,10,12,14 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0053] * * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0065] * * figures 1,2,5-9 *; | [A]WO2012134305 (VELU PANNIRSELVAM A L [NZ]) [A] 6-9,13* the whole document * |