Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015036814 | Global Dossier | 19.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013IB58456 | 11.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10168408 | Global Dossier | 01.01.2019 | B2 | US2016216355 | 28.07.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013IB58456 | 11.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6232140B | Global Dossier | 15.11.2017 | B2 | JP2016530047 | 29.09.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2013IB58456 | 11.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105530861 | Global Dossier | 27.04.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2013IB58456 | 11.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3043703 | Global Dossier | 20.07.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013IB58456 | 11.09.2013 |