Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10080910 | Global Dossier | 25.09.2018 | B2 | US2015306423 | 29.10.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201314649559 | 17.09.2013 | US201261737880 | 17.12.2012 | WO2013IB58588 | 17.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6480868B | Global Dossier | 13.03.2019 | B2 | JP2015536783 | 24.12.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261737880 | 17.12.2012 | WO2013IB58588 | 17.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104884126B | Global Dossier | 03.08.2018 | B | CN104884126 | 02.09.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261737880 | 17.12.2012 | WO2013IB58588 | 17.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2931371 | Global Dossier | 15.07.2020 | B1 | EP2931371 | 21.10.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261737880 | 17.12.2012 | WO2013IB58588 | 17.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112015013796 | 04.10.2022 | B1 | BR112015013796 | 11.07.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201261737880 | 17.12.2012 | WO2013IB58588 | 17.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2648226 | 22.03.2018 | C2 | RU2015129082 | 23.01.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261737880 | 17.12.2012 | WO2013IB58588 | 17.09.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014096993 | Global Dossier | 26.06.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261737880 | 17.12.2012 |