EP2874149 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CONCEALING FRAME ERROR AND METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR AUDIO DECODING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.08.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2023/34] |
Former [2015/21] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUNG, Ho-sang 521-1104 Samsung 5-cha Apt. Pungdeokcheon 2-dong Suji-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 448-785 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Nam-suk 114-1703 Dongsuwon LG Village Apt. Mangpo-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-706 / KR | [2015/21] | Representative(s) | Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [2023/34] |
Former [2015/21] | Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 13800914.7 | 10.06.2013 | [2023/34] | WO2013KR05095 | Priority number, date | US201261657348P | 08.06.2012 Original published format: US 201261657348 P | US201261672040P | 16.07.2012 Original published format: US 201261672040 P | US201261704739P | 24.09.2012 Original published format: US 201261704739 P | [2015/21] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013183977 | Date: | 12.12.2013 | Language: | KO | [2013/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2874149 | Date: | 20.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2874149 | Date: | 23.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 12.12.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G10L19/005, G10L19/02 | [2015/21] | CPC: |
G10L19/005 (EP,KR,US);
G10L19/02 (KR);
G10L19/025 (US);
G10L19/12 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERBERGUNG VON FRAME-FEHLERN UND VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR AUDIODECODIERUNG | [2015/21] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CONCEALING FRAME ERROR AND METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR AUDIO DECODING | [2015/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE MASQUAGE D'ERREURS DE TRAMES ET PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE DÉCODAGE AUDIO | [2015/21] | Entry into regional phase | 08.01.2015 | Translation filed | 08.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 08.01.2015 | Search fee paid | 08.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/21] | 22.03.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 01.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.03.2023 | 13.03.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 29.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23178921.5 / EP4235657 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.09.2020 | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/31] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 01.06.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 01.06.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.06.2017 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 01.06.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 01.06.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.06.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HR | 23.08.2023 | RO | 23.08.2023 | RS | 23.08.2023 | SM | 23.08.2023 | NO | 23.11.2023 | GR | 24.11.2023 | IS | 23.12.2023 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/20] | HR | 23.08.2023 | |
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | HR | 23.08.2023 | |
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | NO | 23.11.2023 | |
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 23.11.2023 | |
GR | 24.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006265216 (CHEN JUIN-HWEY [US]) [A] 9,13 * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0061] *; | [IA]US2008033718 (ZOPF ROBERT W [US], et al) [I] 1,2,4,6,9-15 * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0056]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0068]; figure 2 * [A] 3,5,7,8; | [A]US2008133242 (SUNG HO-SANG [KR], et al) [A] 3* paragraph [0085]; figure 7 *; | [A]EP2092755 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 10,14 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0056]; figures 1A,1B,2 * | International search | [A]US2006184861 (SUN JIANHUA [CN], et al); | [X]KR20060124371 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [Y]KR20070091512 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [A]KR20080075050 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [A]US2011099008 (ZOPF ROBERT W [US]) | Examination | EP2092755 |