EP2858794 - CARPET DRIFT ESTIMATION AND COMPENSATION USING TWO SETS OF SENSORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/16] | CARPET DRIFT ESTIMATION USING DIFFERENTIAL SENSORS OR VISUAL MEASUREMENTS | ||
[2020/45] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.11.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states iRobot Corporation 8 Crosby Drive Bedford, MA 01730 / US | [2021/15] |
Former [2015/16] | For all designated states iRobot Corporation 8 Crosby Drive Bedford, MA 01730 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOEL, Dhiraj 1151 Cordova Street Pasadena, CA 91106 / US | 02 /
EADE, Ethan 345 16th Ave. E. Seattle, WA 98112 / US | 03 /
FONG, Philip 2638 S. Barrington Ave 102 Los Angeles, CA 90064 / US | 04 /
MUNICH, Mario, E. 639 E. Grandview Ave. Sierra Madre, CA 91024 / US | [2015/16] | Representative(s) | Peterreins Schley Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Hermann-Sack-Straße 3 80331 München / DE | [2024/09] |
Former [2021/15] | Peterreins Schley Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Hermann-Sack-Strasse 3 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2015/16] | Durán-Corretjer, S.L.P. Còrsega, 329 (Paseo de Gracia/Diagonal) 08037 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 13801242.2 | 07.06.2013 | [2021/15] | WO2013US44825 | Priority number, date | US201261657399P | 08.06.2012 Original published format: US 201261657399 P | [2015/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013185102 | Date: | 12.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2858794 | Date: | 15.04.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.12.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2858794 | Date: | 14.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/15] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2858794 | Date: | 28.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 12.12.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B25J19/04, B25J5/00, A47L11/32, G05D1/02 | [2016/16] | CPC: |
G05D1/0253 (EP,CN,US);
B25J9/1697 (US);
B25J11/0085 (US);
B25J5/007 (US);
B25J9/1628 (US);
B25J9/1664 (US);
G05D1/0268 (US);
G05D1/027 (EP,CN,US);
G05D1/0272 (EP,CN,US);
G05D1/24 (US);
G05D1/244 (US);
G05D1/40 (US);
|
Former IPC [2015/16] | B25J19/04, B25J5/00, A47L11/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/16] | Title | German: | TEPPICHVERSCHIEBUNGSMESSUNG UND AUSGLEICH DURCH DIE BENUTZUNG VON ZWEI UNTERSCHIEDLICHEN SENSORENSÄTZE | [2020/45] | English: | CARPET DRIFT ESTIMATION AND COMPENSATION USING TWO SETS OF SENSORS | [2020/45] | French: | ESTIMATION ET COMPENSATION DE DÉRIVE PROVOQUÉE PAR UN TAPIS À L'AIDE DE DEUX JEUX DE CAPTEURS DIFFÉRENTS | [2020/45] |
Former [2015/16] | TEPPICHVERSCHIEBUNGSMESSUNG DURCH DIFFERENTIALSENSOREN ODER VISUELLE MESSUNGEN | ||
Former [2015/16] | CARPET DRIFT ESTIMATION USING DIFFERENTIAL SENSORS OR VISUAL MEASUREMENTS | ||
Former [2015/16] | ESTIMATION DE DÉPLACEMENT D'UN TAPIS À L'AIDE DE CAPTEURS DIFFÉRENTIELS OU DE MESURES VISUELLES | Entry into regional phase | 14.10.2014 | National basic fee paid | 14.10.2014 | Search fee paid | 14.10.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.10.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.2014 | Examination requested [2015/16] | 06.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.03.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP21168056.6 / EP3910440 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.11.2017 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
14.01.2022
18.01.2022
ADMISSIBLE Meissner Bolte (UK) Limited 4a Top Land Country Business Park Cragg Vale Hebden Bridge HX7 5RW / GB Opponent's representative Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/08] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
14.01.2022
18.01.2022
ADMISSIBLE Meissner Bolte (UK) Limited 4a Top Land Country Business Park Cragg Vale Hebden Bridge HX7 5RW / GB Opponent's representative Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 47 80538 München / DE | 28.01.2022 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 07.06.2022 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 16.05.2023 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 16.05.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.06.2023 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 30.06.2023 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 27.10.2023 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 23.01.2024 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2015 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   11.09.2015 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.06.2013 | AL | 14.04.2021 | AT | 14.04.2021 | CY | 14.04.2021 | CZ | 14.04.2021 | DK | 14.04.2021 | EE | 14.04.2021 | ES | 14.04.2021 | FI | 14.04.2021 | HR | 14.04.2021 | IT | 14.04.2021 | LT | 14.04.2021 | LV | 14.04.2021 | MC | 14.04.2021 | MK | 14.04.2021 | MT | 14.04.2021 | NL | 14.04.2021 | PL | 14.04.2021 | RO | 14.04.2021 | RS | 14.04.2021 | SE | 14.04.2021 | SI | 14.04.2021 | SK | 14.04.2021 | SM | 14.04.2021 | TR | 14.04.2021 | IE | 07.06.2021 | LU | 07.06.2021 | FR | 14.06.2021 | BE | 30.06.2021 | CH | 30.06.2021 | LI | 30.06.2021 | BG | 14.07.2021 | NO | 14.07.2021 | GR | 15.07.2021 | IS | 14.08.2021 | PT | 16.08.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 07.06.2013 | |
AL | 14.04.2021 | ||
AT | 14.04.2021 | ||
CY | 14.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
MK | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SI | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
TR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IE | 07.06.2021 | ||
LU | 07.06.2021 | ||
FR | 14.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 07.06.2013 | |
AL | 14.04.2021 | ||
AT | 14.04.2021 | ||
CY | 14.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
MK | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SI | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
IE | 07.06.2021 | ||
LU | 07.06.2021 | ||
FR | 14.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 07.06.2013 | |
AL | 14.04.2021 | ||
AT | 14.04.2021 | ||
CY | 14.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SI | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
IE | 07.06.2021 | ||
LU | 07.06.2021 | ||
FR | 14.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 07.06.2013 | |
AL | 14.04.2021 | ||
AT | 14.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SI | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
IE | 07.06.2021 | ||
LU | 07.06.2021 | ||
FR | 14.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 14.04.2021 | |
AT | 14.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SI | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
IE | 07.06.2021 | ||
LU | 07.06.2021 | ||
FR | 14.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 14.04.2021 | |
AT | 14.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SI | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
IE | 07.06.2021 | ||
LU | 07.06.2021 | ||
FR | 14.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 14.04.2021 | |
AT | 14.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SI | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
IE | 07.06.2021 | ||
LU | 07.06.2021 | ||
FR | 14.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 14.04.2021 | |
AT | 14.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
IE | 07.06.2021 | ||
LU | 07.06.2021 | ||
FR | 14.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 14.04.2021 | |
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
IE | 07.06.2021 | ||
LU | 07.06.2021 | ||
FR | 14.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 14.04.2021 | |
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
IE | 07.06.2021 | ||
LU | 07.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AT | 14.04.2021 | |
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
LU | 07.06.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 14.04.2021 | |
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 14.04.2021 | |
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 14.04.2021 | |
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 14.04.2021 | |
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 14.04.2021 | |
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 14.04.2021 | |
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 14.04.2021 | |
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 14.04.2021 | |
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AT | 14.04.2021 | |
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 14.04.2021 | |
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPH1055215 (MINOLTA CO LTD) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0001] , [0021] - [0022] - [0025] , [0108] - [0111] - [0143]; figures 3-4; claim 1 * [A] 4-13; | [XA]US2009157227 (PARK JUN-HO [KR], et al) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0003] , [0029] , [0033] - [0035] - [0 40] , [0042] - paragraph [0046]; figures 4-5; claims 1-3,5 * [A] 4-13; | [XA]US2011054686 (LEE HYOUNG-KI [KR], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0055] - [0059]; figures 4-5; claims 1,5 *[A] 2-13; | [XA]WO2011052827 (YUJIN ROBOT CO LTD [KR], et al) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0043] , [0049] , [0055] - [0057] - [0066]; figures 2-4; claims 1,8-9 * [A] 4-13; | [XI] - XIAOJING SONG ET AL, "A robust slip estimation method for skid-steered mobile robots", CONTROL, AUTOMATION, ROBOTICS AND VISION, 2008. ICARCV 2008. 10TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20081217), ISBN 978-1-4244-2286-9, pages 279 - 284, XP031433600 [X] 1,7-11,13 * page 280 - page 284, column L; figures 1-4 * [I] 12 | International search | [A]JPH07116087 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [X]JP3227710B (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO., LTD.); | [A]JP2005222226 (FUNAI ELECTRIC CO); | [A]JP2005346477 (TOSHIBA TEC KK); | [Y]KR20110021191 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) | Examination | JP2010167055 | US2011125323 | by applicant | WO2011052827 | - X. SONG, "A robust slip estimation method for skid-steered mobile robots", proceedings of the 10th International IEEE Conference on Control, Automation, Robotics and Vision, (20080000), pages 279 - 284, XP031433600 | Opposition | JPH04263821 | JPH04312104 | JPH04338437 | JPH0561540 | JPH07116087 | JPH07244735 | JPH1055215 | US2005267631 | US2006253224 | US2009157227 | JP2009186213 | US2011054686 | WO2011052827 | US2012219207 |