EP2890723 - POLYMER DISPERSIONS HAVING MULTIMODAL PARTICLE SIZE DISTRIBUTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.10.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.11.2017 [2017/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Celanese Sales Germany GmbH Am Unisys-Park 1 65843 Sulzbach / DE | [2016/23] |
Former [2015/28] | For all designated states Celanese Emulsions GmbH Am Unisys-Park 1 65843 Sulzbach (Taunus) / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JAKOB, Martin Freiherr-vom-Stein-Str. 35 65779 Kelkheim / DE | 02 /
RUPPERT, Marcel Grosse Nelkenstrasse 28 60488 Frankfurt Am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/28] | 01 /
JAKOB, Martin Freiherr-vom-Stein-Str. 35 65779 Kelkheim / DE | ||
02 /
RUPPERT, Marcel Voltastrasse 69a 60486 Frankfurt Am Main / DE | Representative(s) | Herr, Ulrike Maria, et al Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Prinzregentenstraße 68 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/28] | Hupfer, Bernd Celanese GmbH IP-EU Am Unisys-Park 1 DE-65843 Sulzbach (Taunus) / DE | Application number, filing date | 13801717.3 | 28.08.2013 | WO2013IB02486 | Priority number, date | US201261695640P | 31.08.2012 Original published format: US 201261695640 P | [2015/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014033545 | Date: | 06.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2890723 | Date: | 08.07.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C08F2/24 | [2015/28] | CPC: |
C08F2/28 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/28] | Title | German: | POLYMERDISPERSIONEN MIT EINER MULTIMODALEN TEILCHENGRÖSSENVERTEILUNG | [2015/28] | English: | POLYMER DISPERSIONS HAVING MULTIMODAL PARTICLE SIZE DISTRIBUTION | [2015/28] | French: | DISPERSIONS DE POLYMÈRE AYANT UNE DISTRIBUTION MULTIMODALE DE LA TAILLE DES PARTICULES | [2015/28] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2014 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/28] | 16.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/48] | 26.07.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/48] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.02.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2017 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [IA]EP1510529 (CELANESE EMULSIONS GMBH [DE]) [I] 1-20,29-31 * example -; claim - * * paragraph [0098] - paragraph [0099] * [A] 21-28; | [IA]DE19739936 (CLARIANT GMBH [DE]) [I] 1-20,29-31 * example -; claim - * * page 5, line 24 - line 32 * [A] 21-28 | Examination | JP2002069105 | by applicant | US685281 | US2005043463 | US4104220 | US4111877 | US4219454 | US4319032 | US4599417 | US5208285 |