|
14.03.2022 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.05.2021 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.04.2021 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.03.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.03.2021 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.03.2021 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
29.03.2021 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
23.11.2020 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.11.2020 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.11.2020 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.11.2020 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.2020 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
56 |
|
23.11.2020 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
56 |
|
19.11.2020 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
19.11.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.11.2020 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.2020 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.2020 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.2020 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.11.2020 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.10.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
07.10.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
07.10.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
07.10.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
07.10.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
07.10.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
07.10.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.2020 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.10.2020 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.10.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2020 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2020 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.09.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.09.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
03.09.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
03.09.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.09.2020 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
04.06.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.2020 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
27.05.2020 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.05.2020 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.03.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2020 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
11.03.2020 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.03.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2020 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2020 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2020 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.2020 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.12.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.12.2019 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.12.2019 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.12.2019 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.2019 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.11.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.2019 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.11.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
13.11.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.11.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
13.11.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.2019 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
30.07.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.07.2019 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.07.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
23.07.2019 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.06.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.06.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.06.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2019 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.02.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.02.2019 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.01.2019 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2018 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.06.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.08.2015 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.07.2015 |
Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.06.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.06.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.06.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.06.2015 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
20.05.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.05.2015 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.05.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
20.05.2015 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.05.2015 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.03.2015 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.06.2014 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
82 |
|
12.06.2014 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
89 |
|
22.05.2014 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.05.2014 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
56 |
|
06.02.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
06.02.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
06.02.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
25.11.2013 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
25.11.2013 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
7 |
|
25.11.2013 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
37 |
|
25.11.2013 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
10 |
|
11.11.2013 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |