EP2929665 - METHOD, ASSEMBLY FOR PROCESSING INFORMATION IN A DOMESTIC APPLIANCE, AND DOMESTIC APPLIANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.09.2020 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.09.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.06.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2015/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAUGLER, Johannes An der Kreuzbreite 16 93073 Neutraubling / DE | 02 /
KOLBE, Andreas Schillerfalterstr. 54 12683 Berlin / DE | 03 /
LEITL-NOBEL, Martin Kolpingstraße 6 86465 Welden / DE | 04 /
RANCK, Sharon Auf der Leiten 10a 89407 Dillingen / DE | 05 /
SIPPEL, Matthias Bergstr. 9 83329 Waging am See / DE | [2015/42] | Application number, filing date | 13802297.5 | 27.11.2013 | [2015/42] | WO2013EP74873 | Priority number, date | DE201210222248 | 04.12.2012 Original published format: DE102012222248 | [2015/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014086640 | Date: | 12.06.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2929665 | Date: | 14.10.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2929665 | Date: | 30.10.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04L9/32, H04L12/28 | [2015/42] | CPC: |
H04L9/3215 (EP,US);
H04L12/2818 (EP);
H04L63/083 (EP);
H04L63/12 (EP);
H04L63/18 (EP);
H02J13/00024 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, ANORDNUNG ZUR VERARBEITUNG VON INFORMATIONEN IN EINEM HAUSHALTSGERÄT SOWIE HAUSHALTSGERÄT | [2015/42] | English: | METHOD, ASSEMBLY FOR PROCESSING INFORMATION IN A DOMESTIC APPLIANCE, AND DOMESTIC APPLIANCE | [2015/42] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, ENSEMBLE DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS DANS UN APPAREIL MÉNAGER AINSI QU'APPAREIL MÉNAGER | [2015/42] | Entry into regional phase | 06.07.2015 | National basic fee paid | 06.07.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.07.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/42] | 22.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.09.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.11.2018 | Opposition(s) | 31.07.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.11.2013 | AL | 30.10.2019 | CY | 30.10.2019 | CZ | 30.10.2019 | DK | 30.10.2019 | EE | 30.10.2019 | FI | 30.10.2019 | HR | 30.10.2019 | LT | 30.10.2019 | LV | 30.10.2019 | MC | 30.10.2019 | MK | 30.10.2019 | MT | 30.10.2019 | NL | 30.10.2019 | PL | 30.10.2019 | RO | 30.10.2019 | RS | 30.10.2019 | SI | 30.10.2019 | SK | 30.10.2019 | SM | 30.10.2019 | AT | 27.11.2019 | IE | 27.11.2019 | LU | 27.11.2019 | BE | 30.11.2019 | CH | 30.11.2019 | LI | 30.11.2019 | BG | 30.01.2020 | NO | 30.01.2020 | GR | 31.01.2020 | IS | 29.02.2020 | PT | 02.03.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 27.11.2013 | |
AL | 30.10.2019 | ||
CY | 30.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
MC | 30.10.2019 | ||
MT | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SI | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
AT | 27.11.2019 | ||
IE | 27.11.2019 | ||
LU | 27.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 27.11.2013 | |
AL | 30.10.2019 | ||
CY | 30.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
MC | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SI | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
AT | 27.11.2019 | ||
IE | 27.11.2019 | ||
LU | 27.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
CY | 30.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
MC | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SI | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
AT | 27.11.2019 | ||
IE | 27.11.2019 | ||
LU | 27.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/11] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
MC | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SI | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
AT | 27.11.2019 | ||
IE | 27.11.2019 | ||
LU | 27.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
MC | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SI | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
IE | 27.11.2019 | ||
LU | 27.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
MC | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
IE | 27.11.2019 | ||
LU | 27.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
MC | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
LU | 27.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
MC | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
LU | 27.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
LU | 27.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | FI | 30.10.2019 | |
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | FI | 30.10.2019 | |
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 30.10.2019 | |
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 30.10.2019 | |
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 30.01.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1215639 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [XI]US2009156193 (URBANIJA MILOS [SI], et al) [X] 1-5,8,13-16 * figures 3,4 * * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0074] * [I] 6,7,9-12; | [A]US2011055565 (MURAKAMI SHINGO [JP], et al) [A] 1-16 * paragraphs [0001] - [0006] * * figure 2 * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0062] * * figure 10 * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0132] *; | [A]DE102010031283 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [A] 1-16* the whole document *; | [A]US2012230482 (GAVILLET GILLES [CH]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A] - SHINTARO MIZUNO ET AL, "A Mobile Phone Based Authentication Service for Home Appliances", CONSUMER COMMUNICATIONS AND NETWORKING CONFERENCE, 2007. CCNC 2007. 20 07 4TH IEEE, IEEE, PI, (20070101), ISBN 978-1-4244-0667-8, pages 1168 - 1169, XP031087967 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * |