EP2964726 - METHOD OF FUEL FOR ENERGETICS PRODUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/02] | METHOD OF FUEL FOR ENERGETICS PRODUCTION AND FUEL PRODUCING DEVICE | ||
[2016/50] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SM | published on 28.03.2018 [2018/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HEDVIGA GROUP, a.s. Husova 464 738 01 Frýdek, Frýdek-Místek / CZ | [N/P] |
Former [2017/14] | For all designated states HEDVIGA GROUP, A.S. Husova 464 738 01 Mistek, Frydek-Mistek / CZ | ||
Former [2016/02] | For all designated states HEDVIGA GROUP, A.S. Priborska 602 738 01 Mistek, Frydek-Mistek / CZ | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CUBER, Petr Na Osinách 247/8 736 01 Haví ov- ivotice / CZ | 02 /
PULLMANOVÁ, Monika Na Slezance 330/5 739 32 Vratimov / CZ | [2016/02] | Representative(s) | Rylkova, Iva Polska 1525 708 00 Ostrava-Poruba / CZ | [N/P] |
Former [2016/02] | Rylkova, Iva Polska 1525 CZ-708 00 Ostrava-Poruba / CZ | Application number, filing date | 13802858.4 | 21.10.2013 | [2016/02] | WO2013CZ00133 | Priority number, date | CZ20130000677 | 04.09.2013 Original published format: CZ 20130677 | [2016/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015032367 | Date: | 12.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2964726 | Date: | 13.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.03.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2964726 | Date: | 05.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/14] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP2964726 | Date: | 19.07.2017 | [2017/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C10B47/46, C10B47/06 | [2016/02] | CPC: |
C10B47/46 (EP,US);
C10B57/02 (GB);
C10B47/06 (EP,US);
C10B47/10 (US);
C10B47/14 (US);
C10B53/00 (GB);
C10B53/07 (EP,GB,US);
C10B57/14 (GB);
C10G1/00 (GB);
C10G1/02 (GB);
C10G1/10 (GB);
C10K1/04 (EP,US);
F02B43/08 (EP,US);
Y02E20/12 (EP,US);
Y02P20/129 (US);
Y02P20/143 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR PRODUKTION VON KRAFTSTOFF FÜR ENERGETIK | [2016/50] | English: | METHOD OF FUEL FOR ENERGETICS PRODUCTION | [2016/50] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN COMBUSTIBLE DESTINÉ À L'ÉNERGÉTIQUE | [2016/50] |
Former [2016/02] | VERFAHREN ZUR PRODUKTION VON KRAFTSTOFF FÜR ENERGETIK UND KRAFTSTOFFPRODUKTIONSVORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2016/02] | METHOD OF FUEL FOR ENERGETICS PRODUCTION AND FUEL PRODUCING DEVICE | ||
Former [2016/02] | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN COMBUSTIBLE DESTINÉ À L'ÉNERGÉTIQUE ET DISPOSITIF DE PRODUCTION DE COMBUSTIBLE | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.2015 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.09.2015 | Examination requested [2016/02] | 16.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 03.02.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.02.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.12.2016 | Opposition(s) | 08.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 05.04.2017 | SM | 05.04.2017 | [2018/13] |
Former [2018/10] | CZ | 05.04.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE4103738 (USS CO [JP]) [A] 1-22* figures 1-5 *; | [XAI]DE10348987 (BERNDT PEGGY DIANA [DE]) [X] 12 * figures 1-3 * [A] 1-11 [I] 13-22; | [A]DE202007014636U (KARL LEY GMBH INDUSTRIEOFENBAU [DE]) [A] 1-22 * figures 1-4 *; | [A] - Wikipedia, "Torrefaction", (20130618), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20130617153118/http://en.wikipedia.org/wiki/Torrefaction, (20140605), XP002725453 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * | [A] - Patrick ) Reumerman ET AL, "CHARCOAL PRODUCTION WITH REDUCED EMISSIONS", (20020101), URL: http://www.cleanfuels.nl/Projects & publications/Charcoal Production with Reduced Emissions (paper).pdf, (20140205), XP055100537 [A] 1-22 * figure 3 * * paragraph [02.2] * | by applicant | CZ280465 | CZ21515U | CZ21978U | CZ20100000586 |