EP2926516 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR PHASE ROTATING DUPLICATE FRAMES IN WIRELESS LAN TRANSMISSIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.02.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.04.2020 [2020/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2015/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Lin 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
TIAN, Bin 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
VERMANI, Sameer 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2015/41] | Representative(s) | Wegner, Hans Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2015/41] | Application number, filing date | 13803414.5 | 27.11.2013 | [2015/41] | WO2013US72375 | Priority number, date | US201261732001P | 30.11.2012 Original published format: US 201261732001 P | US201261734496P | 07.12.2012 Original published format: US 201261734496 P | US201314091052 | 26.11.2013 Original published format: US201314091052 | [2015/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014085686 | Date: | 05.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2926516 | Date: | 07.10.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.06.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/26 | [2015/41] | CPC: |
H04L27/2621 (EP,US);
H04L27/2602 (EP,US);
H04L27/2613 (EP,US);
H04L27/26025 (EP,US);
H04L27/26132 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/41] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN FÜR PHASENROTIERENDE DUPLIZIERTE RAHMEN BEI WLAN-ÜBERTRAGUNGEN | [2015/41] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR PHASE ROTATING DUPLICATE FRAMES IN WIRELESS LAN TRANSMISSIONS | [2015/41] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DESTINÉS À LA ROTATION DE PHASE DE TRAMES EN DOUBLE DANS DES TRANSMISSIONS LAN SANS FIL | [2015/41] | Entry into regional phase | 12.05.2015 | National basic fee paid | 12.05.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.05.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.05.2015 | Examination requested [2015/41] | 12.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.05.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/14] | 14.11.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/14] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.05.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2019 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2012051454 (ZHENG JUN [US], et al) [A] 1,6,11 * paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0105] - paragraph [0128] ** figures 17,18 *; | [XA]US2012269069 (PORAT RON [US], et al) [X] 6-10 * figure 20 * * paragraph [0156] - paragraph [0194] * * paragraph [0207] * [A] 1,11; | [A] - HONGYUAN ZHANG (MARVELL), "1MHz Dup mode ; 11-12-1313-00-00ah-1mhz-dup-mode", IEEE SA MENTOR; 11-12-1313-00-00AH-1MHZ-DUP-MODE, IEEE-SA MENTOR, PISCATAWAY, NJ USA, (20121112), vol. 802.11ah, pages 1 - 11, XP068040154 [A] 1,6,11 * page 5 - page 7 * | [XP] - MINYOUNG PARK (INTEL CORP), "TGah-SFD-D14.x ; 11-13-0599-00-00ah-tgah-sfd-d14-x", IEEE SA MENTOR; 11-13-0599-00-00AH-TGAH-SFD-D14-X, IEEE-SA MENTOR, PISCATAWAY, NJ USA, (20130515), vol. 802.11ah, pages 1 - 76, XP068054133 [XP] 1-15 * page 21 * |