EP2862206 - MULTILAYER SUBSTRATE STRUCTURE AND METHOD AND SYSTEM OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.06.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.07.2019 [2019/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tivra Corporation 3343 B Vincent Road Pleasant Hill, California 94602 / US | [2015/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE, Indranil 2390 West Middlefield Road Apartment 10 Mountain View, California 94043 / US | 02 /
MACHUCA, Francisco 4159 Midvale Avenue Oakland, California 94602 / US | [2015/17] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/17] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13803800.5 | 12.06.2013 | WO2013US45482 | Priority number, date | US201261659944P | 14.06.2012 Original published format: US 201261659944 P | US201261662918P | 22.06.2012 Original published format: US 201261662918 P | US201313794372 | 11.03.2013 Original published format: US201313794372 | US201313794327 | 11.03.2013 Original published format: US201313794327 | US201313794285 | 11.03.2013 Original published format: US201313794285 | [2015/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013188574 | Date: | 19.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2862206 | Date: | 22.04.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.05.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C30B1/02, C30B23/00, C30B23/02, C30B25/16, C30B25/18, C30B29/52, C30B29/40 | [2016/01] | CPC: |
C30B1/02 (EP,CN);
C30B23/005 (EP,CN);
C30B23/025 (EP,CN);
C30B25/165 (EP,CN);
C30B25/183 (EP,CN);
C30B25/186 (EP,CN);
|
Former IPC [2015/17] | H01L33/00, H01L29/15, H01L33/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/17] | Title | German: | MEHRSCHICHTIGE SUBSTRATSTRUKTUR UND VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2015/17] | English: | MULTILAYER SUBSTRATE STRUCTURE AND METHOD AND SYSTEM OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME | [2015/17] | French: | STRUCTURE DE SUBSTRAT MULTICOUCHE, ET PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE FABRICATION DE CELLE-CI | [2015/17] | Entry into regional phase | 11.12.2014 | National basic fee paid | 11.12.2014 | Search fee paid | 11.12.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.12.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/17] | 23.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/28] | 27.02.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/28] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.07.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2016 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   22.12.2016 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]WO2007094516 (SHOWA DENKO KK [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,7-9,11-13 * figures 4, 6 * * claims 1, 3, 10 * [A] 15 [I] 14; | [XAI]US2008164570 (KOUVETAKIS JOHN [US], et al) [X] 1-9,11-13 * figure 2 * * claims 1, 4 * * examples 5, 6 * [A] 15 [I] 14; | [XAI]JP2007294579 (SHOWA DENKO KK) [X] 1-3,7-9,11-13 * figures 6, 7 * * paragraphs [0062] - [0064] - [0 52] - [0057] * [A] 15 [I] 10,14 | International search | [X]EP0499982 (ENERGY CONVERSION DEVICES INC [US]); | [X]US7229500 (HAUSHALTER ROBERT C [US], et al); | [Y]US2009278164 (OSAWA HIROSHI [JP], et al); | [Y]US2003017626 (HILT LYNDEE L [US], et al); | [Y]US2003043872 (YOKOZEKI MIKIHIRO [JP], et al); | [Y]US7435300 (LING KOW-JE [TW], et al); | [A]US4999314 (PRIBAT DIDIER [FR], et al); | [A]US6645833 (BRENDEL ROLF [DE]); | [A]US5906857 (MCKEE RODNEY ALLEN [US], et al); | [A]US4222345 (BERGFELT NILS H, et al); | [A]GB1113211 (RCA CORP); | [A]US5821562 (MAKITA NAOKI [JP], et al) | [Y] - "Phase Diagram Images and Software from the National Physical Laboratory (NPL) for the Zr-Ti System", (20000504), URL: http://resource.npl.co.uk/mtdata/phdiagrams/png/hfzr.png, (20131112), XP055177727 | [Y] - ADACHI, S., "Properties of Semiconductor Alloys: Group-IV, III-V and II-VI Semiconductors", JOHN WILEY & SONS, (2009), XP055177728 | [Y] - CVERNA, F., "ASM Ready Reference: Thermal Properties of Metals (#06702G)", THERMAL EXPANSION. ASM INTERNATIONAL, (2002), XP055177730 | by applicant | WO2007094516 | US2008164570 | JP2007294579 |