EP2862005 - RELIABILITY FOR LOCATION SERVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.09.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.10.2018 [2018/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2015/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GROBMAN, Steve L. 1511 Southridge Ct. El Dorado Hills, California 95762 / US | [2015/17] | Representative(s) | HGF Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/17] | Jennings, Vincent Louis, et al HGF Limited Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 13803830.2 | 03.06.2013 | WO2013US43863 | Priority number, date | US201213523819 | 14.06.2012 Original published format: US201213523819 | [2015/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013188148 | Date: | 19.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2862005 | Date: | 22.04.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 19.12.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01S19/08, H04W12/12, H04W4/02, // H04W88/02 | [2016/07] | CPC: |
H04W12/12 (EP,CN,US);
G01S19/08 (EP,CN,US);
H04W12/63 (EP,CN,US);
H04W4/027 (EP,CN,US);
H04W4/029 (EP,CN,US);
H04W88/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/17] | G01S19/01 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/17] | Title | German: | ZUVERLÄSSIGKEIT FÜR ORTUNGSDIENSTE | [2015/17] | English: | RELIABILITY FOR LOCATION SERVICES | [2015/17] | French: | FIABILITÉ DE SERVICES DE LOCALISATION | [2015/17] | Entry into regional phase | 20.11.2014 | National basic fee paid | 20.11.2014 | Search fee paid | 20.11.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.11.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/17] | 01.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.11.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/42] | 02.05.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/42] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.11.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2018 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO03067404 (CONAX AS [NO], et al) [A] 1-15* page 2, 4th paragraph *; | [I]US7096029 (PARUPUDI GOPAL [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * figures 6,7 * * column 5, line 35 - line 63 * * column 7, line 20 - line 25 * * column 7, line 47 - line 48 * * column 20, line 5 - column 21, line 15 * * column 22, line 42 - line 55 *; | [I]US2009160711 (MEHTA CHAND [US]) [I] 1-15 * figures 4B, 7 * * paragraphs [0020] , [0021] , [0023] * * paragraphs [0028] , [0060] , [0082] * * paragraphs [0090] , [0091] *; | [XI]US2010250727 (KING SIMON P [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-10,12-15 * paragraphs [0087] , [0088] , [0101] * * paragraphs [0129] , [0143] * [I] 5,11; | [I]US2011117924 (BRUNNER CHRISTOPHER [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * figure 3 * * paragraphs [0014] , [0 21] , [0022] * * paragraphs [0034] , [0039] * | International search | [A]US2003040852 (GREEN GAYLORD B [US], et al); | [Y]US2004073364 (JUNG MUN HO [KR], et al); | [A]US2008137663 (GU JA BEOM [KR], et al); | [A]JP2008145274 (ELECTRONIC NAVIGATION RES INST); | [Y]US2011106450 (TODA HIROYUKI [JP], et al) | by applicant | US2010250727 |