EP2870989 - GAS PURIFICATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.02.2017 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.03.2017 [2017/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Khamidullin, Rafik Nailovich ul. Chingiza Aitmatova, 7-147 Kazan, 420140 / RU | [2015/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2015/20] | Representative(s) | Manzella & Associati Via dell'Indipendenza, 13 40121 Bologna / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2015/20] | Manzella & Associati Via Nosadella, 9 40123 Bologna / IT | Application number, filing date | 13803846.8 | 05.06.2013 | WO2013RU00459 | Priority number, date | RU20120124943 | 15.06.2012 Original published format: RU 2012124943 | [2015/20] | Filing language | RU | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013187802 | Date: | 19.12.2013 | Language: | RU | [2013/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2870989 | Date: | 13.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 27.03.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B01D47/05, B01D53/14, B01D53/26 | [2016/13] | CPC: |
B01D53/14 (EP,CN,US);
B01D47/05 (EP,CN,US);
B01D53/002 (EP,CN,US);
B01D53/1406 (US);
B01D53/265 (EP,US);
B01D2257/504 (EP,US);
B01D2257/702 (EP,US);
F24F2013/228 (EP,US);
F24F3/1405 (EP,US);
Y02P70/10 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/20] | B01D47/05, B01D53/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/20] | Title | German: | GASREINIGUNGSVERFAHREN | [2015/20] | English: | GAS PURIFICATION METHOD | [2015/20] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PURIFICATION DE GAZ | [2015/20] | Entry into regional phase | 15.01.2015 | Translation filed | 15.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 15.01.2015 | Search fee paid | 15.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/20] | 21.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/13] | 07.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2016 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2009241814 (BENTZEN JENS DALL [DK]) [X] 1,3 * paragraphs [0065] - [0068]; figures 2,3 * [I] 2; | [X]US2012042779 (MCDONALD DENNIS K [US], et al) [X] 1,3 * paragraphs [0014] , [0019] , [0024]; figure 1 *; | [E]EP2644248 (CHENG YUAN ENVIRONMENTAL TECHNOLOGY CO LTD [TW]) [E] 1* paragraph [0016]; figure 3 * | International search | [A]SU352094 (KIEVSKYI POLITEKHNICHESKY INSTITUT); | [A]RU2139751 (OTKRYTOE AKTSIONERNOE OBSHCHES, et al); | [A]RU2217221 (KURSKY GOSUDARSTVENNY TEKHNICHESKY UNIVERSITET); | [A]US2008112869 (MACKNIGHT ALLEN K [US]) | by applicant | RU2179880 | - N.V. TSARENKO; V.M. MINAKOVSKY; V.A. ANTONENKO, "Specification of author's certificate No. 352094 21.09.1972", GAS TREATMENT METHOD |