EP2861710 - CYCLIC BIOCONVERSION PROCESSES AND BIOREACTOR ASSEMBLIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.03.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.04.2017 [2017/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microvi Biotech Inc. 26229 Eden Landing Road Hayward, CA 94587 / US | [2015/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAZAVI-SHIRAZI, Fatemeh 28839 Bay Heights Road Hayward, CA 94542 / US | 02 /
DORRI, Mohammad, Ali 600 South Abel Street 321 Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | 03 /
RAZAVI, Ameen (nmn) 5011 Crystal Terrace Fremont, CA 94555 / US | [2015/17] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2015/17] | Jansen, Cornelis Marinus, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 13803990.4 | 14.06.2013 | WO2013US46029 | Priority number, date | US201261689921P | 15.06.2012 Original published format: US 201261689921 P | US201361849725P | 01.02.2013 Original published format: US 201361849725 P | [2015/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013188852 | Date: | 19.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2861710 | Date: | 22.04.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.12.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C12M1/00, C12M1/12, C12N1/00 | [2015/17] | CPC: |
C12M23/34 (EP,US);
C12P7/04 (US);
C12M25/20 (EP,US);
C12M27/24 (EP,US);
C12M29/18 (EP,US);
C12N11/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/17] | Title | German: | CYCLISCHES BIOKONVERSIONSVERFAHREN UND BIOREAKTORANORDNUNGEN | [2015/17] | English: | CYCLIC BIOCONVERSION PROCESSES AND BIOREACTOR ASSEMBLIES | [2015/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE BIOCONVERSION CYCLIQUE ET ENSEMBLES DE BIORÉACTEURS | [2015/17] | Entry into regional phase | 12.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 12.01.2015 | Search fee paid | 12.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/17] | 05.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/15] | 16.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2016 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO0001803 (GRACE W R & CO [US]) [X] 1-4 * p. 2 li. 11-15, p. 3 li. 26-28, p. 6 li. 17-20, p. 7 li. 14; p. 8 li. 7-8; p. 8 li. 25-26, p. 10 li. 11-29;; claims 5, 7, 9, , 11, 29 * [I] 10; | [XI]US2009104676 (TSAI SHIH-PERNG [US], et al) [X] 1-9,11-13 * [0015], [0021], [0023], [0026], [0028], [0047]-[0051], [0053], [0066], [0073];; figures 1-6, 9-10, 12; claims 1, 13-15, 21 *[I] 10; | [XI]US2010105116 (DATTA RATHIN [US], et al) [X] 1-9,11-13 * [0012]-[0014], [0017]-[0018], [0020], [0028]-[0030], [0036]-[0039], [0042], [0046], [0050], [0053], [0057]-[0058], [0062], [0085], example;; figures 1-2; claim 1 * [I] 10 | International search | [Y]EP0465131 (EARTHNICS CORP [JP]); | [A]US2010105116 (DATTA RATHIN [US], et al); | [A]US2010294642 (DATTA RATHIN [US], et al); | [A]US7923227 (HICKEY ROBERT [US], et al); | [Y]US7977089 (WIKSWO JOHN P [US], et al); | [A]US2011183390 (HICKEY ROBERT [US], et al); | [Y]US8062873 (TSAI SHIH-PERNG [US], et al); | [A]US2012070888 (TSAI SHIH-PERNG [US], et al); | [A]US8198055 (DATTA RATHIN [US], et al) |