|
18.11.2020 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2020 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.2019 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.12.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.12.2019 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.12.2019 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.12.2019 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.12.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.2019 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.07.2019 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.07.2019 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.2019 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
42 |
|
26.07.2019 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
43 |
|
03.07.2019 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.06.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.06.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.04.2019 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.03.2019 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
21.03.2019 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.03.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.03.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.03.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2019 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.11.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.11.2018 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.06.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.03.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.03.2018 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.11.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
23.11.2017 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.11.2017 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.2017 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.11.2017 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.09.2017 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.08.2017 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.08.2017 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.06.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.06.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.2017 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.03.2017 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.11.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.11.2016 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.08.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.08.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.08.2016 |
Priority search results |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
15.08.2016 |
Reply to invitation to file a copy of priority search results |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.08.2016 |
Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.2016 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.2016 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.06.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
20.06.2016 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.06.2016 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.06.2016 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
11.12.2015 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.2015 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.2015 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.11.2015 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.2015 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.06.2015 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.06.2015 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.06.2015 |
Partial European search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.03.2015 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.02.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.02.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.02.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.01.2015 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
05.01.2015 |
Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
12.12.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.12.2014 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.12.2014 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.12.2014 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
12.12.2014 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
33 |
|
12.12.2014 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
54 |
|
12.12.2014 |
Amended drawings filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
12.12.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
12.12.2014 |
Description |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
12.12.2014 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
12.12.2014 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.12.2014 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.10.2014 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.03.2014 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
42 |
|
19.12.2013 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.12.2013 |
Copy of the translated international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.12.2013 |
International publication pamphlet |
Search / examination |
40 |